Colorado District Court
Judge:William J Martinez
Referred: Kelly H Rankin
Case #: 1:16-cv-03192
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2016
Terminated:Oct 19, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 27, 2017 2:58 AM MDT
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By
Franklin D. Patterson
Patterson & Salg, P.C.
contact info
Lindsay Marie Dunn
Patterson & Salg, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company
Represented By
Franklin D. Patterson
Patterson & Salg, P.C.
contact info
Lindsay Marie Dunn
Patterson & Salg, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick Horton
Represented By
Harry Lloyd Scarborough
Wegener Scarborough Younge & Hockensmith LLP
contact info
Meaghan Elaine Fischer
Wegener Scarborough Younge & Hockensmith Llp-Denver
contact info
Stephanie Michelle Taylor
Hagans Montgomery & Rustay, P.C.
contact info
William Fred Hagans
Hagans Montgomery & Rustay, P.C.
contact info
William Gibson Hagans
Hagans Montgomery & Rustay, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sondra Slappey
Represented By
Harry Lloyd Scarborough
Wegener Scarborough Younge & Hockensmith LLP
contact info
Meaghan Elaine Fischer
Wegener Scarborough Younge & Hockensmith Llp-Denver
contact info
Stephanie Michelle Taylor
Hagans Montgomery & Rustay, P.C.
contact info
William Fred Hagans
Hagans Montgomery & Rustay, P.C.
contact info
William Gibson Hagans
Hagans Montgomery & Rustay, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
45 45 order Protective Order Tue 04/10 11:45 AM
ADDENDUM TO THE JUNE 23, 2017 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Kelly H Rankin on 4/10/2018. (cbslc2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
44 44 order Memorandum Thu 03/29 4:58 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding43 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify26 Protective Order of June 23, 2017 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kelly H Rankin by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/29/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
Related: [-]
43 43 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Thu 03/29 4:44 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify26 Protective Order of June 23, 2017 by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company.(Dunn, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Addendum to the June 23, 2017 Protective Order
Thursday, March 22, 2018
42 42 minutes Status Conference Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict Thu 03/22 1:17 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kelly H Rankin: Status Conference held on 3/22/2018. Granting35 Motion for Leave to Restrict. Within 14 days, counsel shall file a stipulated addendum to the protective order, as discussed. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
41 41 order Minute Order Wed 02/28 4:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER re:36 MOTION to Enforce Protective Order,35 MOTION for Leave to Restrict. A Telephone Status Conference is set for 3/22/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Kelly H Rankin. The parties shall initiate a telephone conference amongst themselves prior to calling the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge Kelly H Rankin on 2/28/2018. Text Only Entry (cbslc2)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2018
40 40 order Memorandum Fri 02/16 8:41 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding36 MOTION to Enforce26 Protective Order , to Affirm Confidential Designations and to Seal the June 29, 2017 Deposition of Rosalind Scott filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kelly H Rankin by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/16/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
Related: [-]
39 39 order Memorandum Fri 02/16 8:40 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding35 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kelly H Rankin by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/16/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2018
38 38 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Wed 02/07 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information Firm Name Change by Lindsay Marie Dunn (Dunn, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Restricted Doc. - Level 1 - Viewable by Case Participants & Court Wed 02/07 3:12 PM
RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company..(Dunn, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
36 36 motion Enforce Wed 02/07 2:51 PM
MOTION to Enforce26 Protective Order , to Affirm Confidential Designations and to Seal the June 29, 2017 Deposition of Rosalind Scott by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company. (Dunn, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Leave to Restrict Wed 02/07 2:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company. (Dunn, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
34 34 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Mon 10/23 12:05 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to33 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice filed in this case on 10/19/2017. Text Only Entry (angar, )
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Thu 10/19 3:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company. (Dunn, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2017
32 32 order Minute Order Mon 10/02 8:28 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the31 Notice of Settlement filed by Sondra Slappey, Patrick Horton, the discovery deadlines in this case are stayed. The parties shall file their Dismissal Papers on or before 10/30/2017. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/02/2017. Text Only Entry (cbslc2)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2017
31 31 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 09/29 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Settlement As to All Claims and All Defendants by Plaintiffs Patrick Horton, Sondra Slappey (Hagans, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2017
30 30 minutes Discovery Hearing ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 09/28 10:50 AM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephone Conference held on 9/28/2017. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2017
29 29 order Minute Order Thu 09/21 11:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER. On a party's request, a telephone discovery conference is set for 9/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Counsel shall initiate a conference call among themselves before calling the court at (303) 844-2117 at the scheduled time. The parties may submit discovery materials at issue (not briefs) to Shaffer_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. on 9/26/2017. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/21/2017. Text Only Entry (cbslc1)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2017
28 28 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 08/21 2:50 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/21/2017. Affirmative experts disclosed by 10/5/2017. Rebuttal experts disclosed by 11/2/2017. Discovery due by 12/14/2017. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, ) (Main Document 28 replaced on 8/21/2017 with correct document) (amont, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2017
27 27 order Minute Order Fri 08/18 11:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER: At the parties' request, a Telephone Status Conference is set for 8/21/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. The parties shall initiate a conference call amongst themselves prior to calling the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/18/2017. Text Only Entry (cbslc2)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2017
26 26 order Protective Order Fri 06/23 9:12 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/23/2017. (jgonz, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2017
25 25 order Memorandum Mon 06/19 10:17 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding24 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/19/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2017
24 24 motion Protective Order Fri 06/16 3:59 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company.(Dunn, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Stipulated Protective Order
Thursday, June 15, 2017
23 23 minutes Discovery Hearing Thu 06/15 2:45 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephone Discovery Hearing held on 6/15/2017. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
22 22 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 06/13 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Meaghan E. Fischer by Meaghan Elaine Fischer on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Meaghan Elaine Fischer added to party Patrick Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Meaghan Elaine Fischer added to party Sondra Slappey(pty:pla) (Fischer, Meaghan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2017
21 21 order Minute Order Mon 06/12 4:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER: A Telephone Discovery Hearing is set for 6/15/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. The parties shall initiate a conference call amongst themselves prior to calling the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. If the parties would like for the court to review any discovery materials (not briefs) prior to the conference, they can be submitted to Shaffer_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov by the close of business on Tuesday. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/12/2017. Text Only Entry (cbslc2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
20 20 misc Transcript Thu 06/08 3:15 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Discovery Hearing held on May 19, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-19. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Stevens-Koenig Reporting, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2017
19 19 minutes Discovery Hearing Fri 05/19 11:38 AM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephone Discovery Hearing held on 5/19/2017. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2017
18 18 order Minute Order Fri 05/12 1:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER. On Defendants' request, a telephone discovery conference is set for 5/19/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Counsel shall initiate a conference call amongst themselves before calling the court at (303) 844-2117 at the scheduled time. The parties may submit discovery materials at issue (not briefs) to Shaffer_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. on 5/17/2017. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/12/2017. Text Only Entry (cbslc1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
16 16 misc Transcript Tue 03/28 3:40 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference held on March 14, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-48. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Stevens-Koenig Reporting, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2017
15 15 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/14 1:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/14/17. (amont, )
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 03/14 1:05 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 3/14/2017. Discovery due by 11/30/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 9/5/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2017
13 13 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 03/03 3:34 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Patrick Horton, Sondra Slappey. (Hagans, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2017
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 02/27 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephanie Michelle Taylor on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Stephanie Michelle Taylor added to party Patrick Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Stephanie Michelle Taylor added to party Sondra Slappey(pty:pla) (Taylor, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2017
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 02/08 9:30 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lindsay Marie Dunn on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Lindsay Marie Dunn added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay Marie Dunn added to party State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Dunn, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2017
10 10 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 02/03 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Fred Hagans on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney William Fred Hagans added to party Patrick Horton(pty:pla), Attorney William Fred Hagans added to party Sondra Slappey(pty:pla) (Hagans, William)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 02/03 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Gibson Hagans on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney William Gibson Hagans added to party Patrick Horton(pty:pla), Attorney William Gibson Hagans added to party Sondra Slappey(pty:pla) (Hagans, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
8 8 order Minute Order Wed 02/01 1:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference for 3/14/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. ORDERED that parties shall adhere to the deadlines and instructions as set forth in[LINK:Preparation for Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference] , located on the court's website under "Judicial Officers." Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/1/17. (amont, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/31 12:05 PM
ANSWER to ComplaintAttorney Franklin D. Patterson added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin D. Patterson added to party State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company(pty:dft) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company.(Patterson, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
6 6 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Fri 01/13 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information For Plaintiffs Counsel by Harry Lloyd Scarborough (Scarborough, Harry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
5 5 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Wed 01/11 4:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Scarborough, Harry)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2016
4 4 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 12/30 9:25 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Magistrate Judge Shaffer, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiffs counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/30/2016. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2016
3 3 misc Summons Issued Thu 12/29 4:45 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (amenz, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 12/29 4:40 PM
Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry (amenz, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/29 1:40 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5306540)Attorney Harry Lloyd Scarborough added to party Patrick Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Harry Lloyd Scarborough added to party Sondra Slappey(pty:pla), filed by Patrick Horton, Sondra Slappey.(Scarborough, Harry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet