Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Guaranty Bank, FSB
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01366 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 03, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Guaranty Bank, FSB
330 East Kilbourn Avenue Ste. 1085
Milwauke, WI 53202 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Tue 07/03 3:57 PM
So Ordered Stipulation of Dismissal signed on 7/3/2018 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 07/03 3:58 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1366 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/02 7:59 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice, Hearing
Thu 03/29 3:05 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
ans
Statement
Wed 03/21 6:16 PM
Statement Notice Pursuant to 12 U.S.C. § 1821(d)(6) to Continue Action filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
~Generic~ Order
Tue 10/24 3:36 PM
Order Relieving Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP as Co-Counsel for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. as to Guaranty Bank, FSB signed on 10/24/2017 (White, Greg) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Mon 10/23 9:42 AM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Fri 09/29 5:17 PM
Notice of Proposed Order filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. Objections due by 10/12/2017,(Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Motion, Stay
Tue 09/26 4:40 PM
Order Continuing to Stay Adversary Proceeding Pending Exhaustion of Mandatory Administrative Claims Process signed on 9/26/2017 (White, Greg) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Motion, Stay
Thu 09/21 10:53 AM
Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Exhaustion of Mandatory Administrative Claims Process filed by Matthew S Vignali on behalf of Guaranty Bank, FSB. (Vignali, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Terrence D. Holmes | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Motion, Stay
Wed 06/28 3:05 PM
Order Granting Motion to Stay Adversary Proceeding signed on 6/28/2017 (White, Greg) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Motion, Stay
Tue 06/20 10:45 AM
Motion to Stay Adversary Proceeding 16-01366 filed by Matthew S Vignali on behalf of Guaranty Bank, FSB. (Vignali, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
ans
Statement
Thu 06/08 2:51 PM
Statement Order Setting Briefing Schedule for Motions to Transfer Venue filed in Central Docket - 16-01019 (SCC) filed by Matthew S Vignali on behalf of Guaranty Bank, FSB. (Vignali, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Fri 06/02 12:06 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Notice of Substitution of Party filed by Matthew S Vignali on behalf of Guaranty Bank, FSB. (Vignali, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Opposition Brief
Wed 05/31 9:18 PM
Opposition Brief MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF PLAINTIFF LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC. IN OPPOSITION TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 DECLARATION OF ADAM M. BIALEK IN SUPPORT OF LBHIS OPPOSITION TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 | ||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Mon 05/08 11:42 AM
Letter to Honorable Shelley C. Chapman Filed by Matthew S Vignali on behalf of Guaranty Bank, FSB. (Vignali, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Wed 05/03 3:40 PM
Letter to Honorable Shelley C. Chapman Filed by Matthew S Vignali on behalf of Guaranty Bank, FSB. (Vignali, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Tue 04/18 5:35 PM
Letter Memorandum Endorsed Order Granting Plan Administrators Request; A Pre-Motion Conference is Scheduled for 5/11/17 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Wed 04/12 5:26 PM
Letter LBHI response to letters requesting pre-motion conferences Filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Declaration
Tue 04/04 11:27 AM
Supplemental Declaration of William T. Russell, Jr. in Support of Certain Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss filed by Matthew S Vignali on behalf of Guaranty Bank, FSB. (Vignali, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Revised | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Declaration
Fri 03/31 3:54 PM
Declaration of William T. Russell, Jr. in support of Certain Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss filed by Matthew S Vignali on behalf of Guaranty Bank, FSB. (Vignali, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice, Motion to Set Hearing
Fri 03/31 3:43 PM
Notice of Motion to Set Hearing Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss filed by Matthew S Vignali on behalf of Guaranty Bank, FSB. (Vignali, Matthew) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 03/31 3:33 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Matthew S Vignali on behalf of Guaranty Bank, FSB. (Vignali, Matthew) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
other
Certificate, Service
Mon 03/27 5:28 PM
Certificate of Service of Order to Bind Additional Defendants to the Existing Case Management Order, Order to Administratively Coordinate Adversary Proceeding Dockets Under the Case Management Order and Order Extending Time for Defendants to File Consolidated Motion to Dismiss filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
ans
Statement
Wed 03/08 12:31 PM
Statement An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding (i) directing it to be coordinated with other similar adversary proceedings filed in connection with the jointly administered Chapter 11 cases of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., et al. (Case No. 08-13555 , and (ii) establishing the docket for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. 1st Advantage Mortgage, L.L.C., et al., Adv. Pro. No. 16-01019 as the Central Docket for all Actions, which docket should be consulted for all adversary proceedings covered under the Courts Order filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
ans
Statement
Tue 03/07 7:53 PM
Statement Order Extending Time for Defendants to File Consolidated Motion to Dismiss filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
other
Certificate, Service
Wed 02/22 9:57 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Presentment OF REVISED PROPOSED ORDER TO ADMINISTRATIVELY COORDINATE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS UNDER THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND PURSUANT TO U.S.C. § 105(a) filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/15 3:45 PM
Affidavit of Service of the Memorandum Endorsed Order re: Pre-Motion Conference signed on 2/1/2017 Filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Affidavit of Service
Fri 02/10 8:22 PM
Affidavit of Service of Motion to Administratively Consolidate Adversary Proceeding Dockets Under the Case Management Order filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Fri 02/10 8:13 PM
Notice of Presentment OF REVISED PROPOSED ORDER TO ADMINISTRATIVELY COORDINATE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS UNDER THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND PURSUANT TO U.S.C. § 105(a) filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Thu 01/26 1:40 PM
Letter Response of LBHI to the Letter Requests Submitted Pursuant to the Case Management Order Filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Motion, Approve
Wed 01/25 6:05 PM
Motion to Approve MOTION OF LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC. FOR AN ORDER TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CONSOLIDATE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS UNDER THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND PURSUANT TO U.S.C. § 105(a) AND BANKRUPTCY RULE 7042 filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Motion to Admin Consolidate Dockets | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order to Admin Consolidate Dockets | ||
Monday, January 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion, Seal
Mon 01/16 3:29 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Seal filed by Matthew S Vignali on behalf of Guaranty Bank, FSB. (Vignali, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Redacted Letter Request | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 01/06 6:52 PM
Affidavit of Service of the Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Second Amended Adversary Complaint Filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Fri 12/30 12:26 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Guaranty Bank, FSB (Dawes, Jeanelle) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Thu 12/29 7:11 PM
Adversary case 16-01366 Complaint against Guaranty Bank, FSB Second Amended (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Caleb Durling, Michael A. Rollin, Corey J Longhurst, Mara R Lieber, William A Maher, Adam M. Bialek, James N Lawlor, Maritza Dominguez Braswell, Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Identification of Agreements | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Identification of Defective Loans | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Description of Defect Types |