VM Remodeling Services, Inc.
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert A Mark |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-27158 |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 31, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | May 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 11, 2019 |
Debtor
VM Remodeling Services, Inc.
5420 SW 6th St
Coral Gables, FL 33134-1156 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Soneet Kapila
www.kapilatrustee.com PO Box 14213
Ft Lauderdale, FL 33302 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 12/31/2016 12:03 AM EST |
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 12/30 2:10 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-27158 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28963019. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]
Fri 12/30 1:18 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $335] (Kingcade, Timothy) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset)
Fri 12/30 1:19 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 01/31/2017 at 11:00 AM at 51 SW First Ave Room 102, Miami. Proofs of Claim due by 05/01/2017. (Kingcade, Timothy) |