OnPoint Financial Corporation
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Frank J Bailey |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-14871 |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | May 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2017 |
Debtor
OnPoint Financial Corporation
14 Longwater Dr
Norwell, MA 02061-1612 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
|
Trustee
Debora A. Casey
Chapter 7 Trustee 97 Whiting Street
Hingham, MA 02043 |
Docket last updated: 12/31/2016 12:03 AM EST |
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 12/30 10:23 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-14871 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 16029075, amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7b (Use for AutoAssign Only)
Fri 12/30 2:52 PM
Meeting of Creditors is scheduled on 02/08/2017 at 09:30 AM at Brockton 341 Meeting, 155 West Elm Street, Brockton, Ma 02301. (admin, ) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (Asset)
Fri 12/30 3:08 PM
Corrected Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/8/2017 at 09:30 AM at Brockton 341 Meeting, 155 West Elm Street, Brockton, MA 02301. Proofs of Claims due by 5/9/2017. (sas) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 12/30 10:18 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing Fee in the Amount of $335 Filed by OnPoint Financial Corporation. (Bodoff, Joseph) |