Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Claude M Hilton
Referred: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Case #: 1:16-cv-01610
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2016
Terminated:Jun 13, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 27, 2017 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By
James Matthew Haynes, Jr.
Mccandlish Holton Morris PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Heffelmire
Represented By
Brien Anthony Roche
Johnson & Roche
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
40 40 order So Ordered Wed 06/14 11:38 AM
So Ordered re39 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Eric Heffelmire. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 6/13/17. (klau, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2017
39 39 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 06/12 2:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice with Consent of Defendant by Eric Heffelmire. (Roche, Brien)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2017
38 38 respoth Objection Fri 06/09 11:34 AM
Objection to35 Letter PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF FEES AND COSTS filed by Eric Heffelmire.(Roche, Brien)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Friday, June 02, 2017
37 37 misc Transcript Fri 06/02 11:29 PM
TRANSCRIPT of FTR Gold proceedings held on May 26, 2017, before Judge Theresa C. Buchanan, Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie Goodwin, Telephone number 571-970-3191. Tape Number: FTR Gold. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2017.(egal, julie)
Related: [-]
36 36 order Order Fri 06/02 12:32 PM
ORDER re34 Order on Motion to Compel, ORDERED that plaintiff submit to a deposition noticed by defendant, currently rescheduled for June 14, 2017 ----- The Court takes Defendant's request for attorneys' fees and costs under advisement. Plaintiff must file any objection to defendant's statement of fees and costs by June 9, 2017 (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 6/2/17. (klau, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
35 35 misc Letter Thu 06/01 9:45 AM
Letter /Statement to the Court per Order dated May 26, 2017 . (Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2017
34 34 order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 05/26 2:17 PM
ORDER, for reasons stated from the bench, GRANTING Defendant's14 Motion to Compel Release of Information,16 Motion to Compel Rule 35 Examinations of the Plaintiff,19 Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Heffelmire, and22 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Plaintiff Heffelmire. Defendant shall file a statement of attorneys' fees and costs incurred in connection with Defendant's motions. The Court will issue an additional order as to Plaintiff's deposition date, the Rule 35 examination, and the expert disclosures deadline. /s/ by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 5/26/17. (tbul, )
Related: [-]
33 33 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 05/26 2:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan:Motion Hearing held on 5/26/2017 re:19 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff and Extend Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure Deadline filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation;22 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses From Plaintiff filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation;16 MOTION to Compel Rule 35 Examination filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation; and14 MOTION to Compel Release of Information filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Appearances: Brien Roche for Pltff; James Matthew Haynes and Brennan Morrissette for Deft. Findings stated. All the motions were granted. Order to follow. (Court Reporter FTR.)(tbul, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2017
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/25 12:20 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re22 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses From Plaintiff filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/25 12:05 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff and Extend Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure Deadline filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/25 11:48 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION to Compel Rule 35 Examination filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/25 11:29 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION to Compel Release of Information filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
28 28 respoth Opposition Wed 05/24 1:28 PM
Opposition to22 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses From Plaintiff ,23 Memorandum in Support, filed by Eric Heffelmire.(Roche, Brien)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Errata Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit Exhibit 22
27 27 respoth Opposition Wed 05/24 1:20 PM
Opposition to19 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff and Extend Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure Deadline ,20 Memorandum in Support,, filed by Eric Heffelmire.(Roche, Brien)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit 21
26 26 respoth Opposition Wed 05/24 1:12 PM
Opposition to17 Memorandum in Support,16 MOTION to Compel Rule 35 Examination filed by Eric Heffelmire.(Roche, Brien)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit Exhibit 23,
Att: 24 Exhibit Exhibit 24,
Att: 25 Exhibit Exhibit 25
25 25 respoth Opposition Wed 05/24 1:04 PM
Opposition to14 MOTION to Compel Release of Information ,15 Memorandum in Support, filed by Eric Heffelmire.(Roche, Brien)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit Exhibit 22
Monday, May 22, 2017
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/22 9:40 AM
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Compel Rule 35 Examination ,19 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff and Extend Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure Deadline ,22 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses From Plaintiff ,14 MOTION to Compel Release of Information . Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, )
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 05/22 9:40 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan.19 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff and Extend Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure Deadline ,22 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses From Plaintiff ,16 MOTION to Compel Rule 35 Examination ,14 MOTION to Compel Release of Information (clar, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2017
24 24 misc Notice of Hearing Date Fri 05/19 6:07 PM
Notice of Hearing Date May 26, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. re22 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses From Plaintiff (Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Memorandum in Support Fri 05/19 6:06 PM
Memorandum in Support re22 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses From Plaintiff filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit
22 22 motion Compel Fri 05/19 6:04 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses From Plaintiff by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Notice of Hearing Date Fri 05/19 5:34 PM
Notice of Hearing Date May 26, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. re19 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff and Extend Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure Deadline (Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Memorandum in Support Fri 05/19 5:33 PM
Memorandum in Support re19 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff and Extend Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure Deadline filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit
19 19 motion Compel Fri 05/19 5:30 PM
MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff and Extend Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure Deadline by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Notice of Hearing Date Fri 05/19 5:00 PM
Notice of Hearing Date re16 MOTION to Compel Rule 35 Examination ,14 MOTION to Compel Release of Information (Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Memorandum in Support Fri 05/19 4:57 PM
Memorandum in Support re16 MOTION to Compel Rule 35 Examination filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
16 16 motion Compel Fri 05/19 4:56 PM
MOTION to Compel Rule 35 Examination by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Memorandum in Support Fri 05/19 4:55 PM
Memorandum in Support re14 MOTION to Compel Release of Information filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit
14 14 motion Compel Fri 05/19 4:54 PM
MOTION to Compel Release of Information by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2017
13 13 order Order Mon 05/15 10:57 AM
ORDER that the Plaintiff's Motion to Quash currently calendared for May 26, 2017 is removed from the calendar and is considered to be resolved by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 5/15/17. (klau, )
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Mon 05/15 9:17 AM
Consent MOTION Motion to Quash be considered resolved. re10 MOTION to Quash of Katherine Heffelmire and Eric Heffelmire ,11 Notice of Hearing Date by Eric Heffelmire.(Roche, Brien)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 05, 2017
utility Motions Referred Fri 05/05 9:53 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan.10 MOTION to Quash of Katherine Heffelmire and Eric Heffelmire (klau, )
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/05 9:55 AM
Set Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Katherine Heffelmire and Eric Heffelmire . Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2017
11 11 misc Notice of Hearing Date Thu 05/04 9:44 AM
Notice of Hearing Date of May 26, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. re10 MOTION to Quash of Katherine Heffelmire and Eric Heffelmire (Roche, Brien)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Quash Thu 05/04 9:42 AM
MOTION to Quash of Katherine Heffelmire and Eric Heffelmire by Eric Heffelmire.(Roche, Brien)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Quash
Thursday, April 20, 2017
9 9 order Protective Order Fri 04/21 9:25 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER re: the handling and labeling of confidential materials. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 4/20/17. (tfitz, )
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Memorandum in Support Thu 04/20 2:19 PM
Memorandum in Support re7 Consent MOTION for Protective Order filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Protective Order Thu 04/20 2:18 PM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2017
6 6 order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order Fri 03/17 11:56 AM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that 1. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in submissions presented, the Court makes the following rulings: a. The Joint Proposed Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless modified by the Court. (see Order for details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 3/16/17. (tfitz, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2017
5 5 misc Discovery Plan Mon 03/13 3:18 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Haynes, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
notice Notice (other) Wed 03/01 12:22 PM
NOTICE - Document #5 (duplicate scheduling order) Docketed in Error and removed (tarm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
4 4 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/01 11:51 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2017 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. Discovery due by 7/14/2017. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 2/28/17.(tarm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice,
Att: 2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Thursday, December 29, 2016
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/30 11:21 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(klau, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 12/30 11:19 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (klau, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 12/30 11:19 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Fairfax County, case number 2016-16824 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5310404.), filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(klau, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet