California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine E Bauer
Case #: 8:16-bk-15258
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Feb 06, 2017

Debtor
California Financial Group, Inc.
24422 Avenida de la Carlota Ste 400
Laguna Hills, CA 92653-3634
Represented By
Thomas Greco
O'Hara & Greco, A Law Corporation
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Thomas H Casey (TR)
22342 Avenida Empresa, Suite 200
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 12/31/2016 12:03 AM PST
Friday, December 30, 2016
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 1:21 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(8:16-bk-15258) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43963080. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Fri 3:22 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Related [+] Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 1/13/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/13/2017. (Bustillos, Denise)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor California Financial Group, Inc.
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 1:15 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by California Financial Group, Inc. (Greco, Thomas) Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 1/13/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/13/2017. WARNING: Item subsequently amended by docket entry7 and 8 . Modified on 12/30/2016 (Bustillos, Denise)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 1:19 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor California Financial Group, Inc.. (Greco, Thomas)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 1:21 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor California Financial Group, Inc.. (Greco, Thomas) [DUPLICATE ENTRY SEE ITEM #2 . Modified on 12/30/2016 (Bustillos, Denise)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Fri 1:22 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor California Financial Group, Inc.. (Greco, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Fri 1:25 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) CORRECTED Filed by Debtor California Financial Group, Inc.. (Greco, Thomas)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Fri 1:31 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/06/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 3-110, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. (Greco, Thomas)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC) Fri 3:24 PM
Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) Related [+] (Bustillos, Denise)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor California Financial Group, Inc.
8 8 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 3:26 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Attorney address on the petition PDF does not match CM/ECF. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION ON THIS CASE, HOWEVER, THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE PROPER CHANGE OF ADDRESS, IF APPLICABLE. Petition was filed as complete, but schedules or statements are deficient. THE ATTORNEY DID NOT FILE THE CORPORATE RESOLUTION AUTHORIZING FILING OF PETITION DUE BY 01/13/2017. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS IMMEDIATELY. Related [+] (Bustillos, Denise)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor California Financial Group, Inc.