Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. Northwest Mortgage Group, Inc. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01381 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Northwest Mortgage Group, Inc.
312 NW 10th Avenue Suite 200
Portland,, OR 97209 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Larry Unger
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Engelke
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Thu 01/19 10:03 AM
So Ordered Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice signed on 1/19/2017 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 01/19 10:04 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1381 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Stipulation
Tue 01/17 5:41 PM
Stipulation and [Proposed Order] of Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Tue 01/03 11:31 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Robert Engelke ; Northwest Mortgage Group, Inc. ; James Smith ; Larry Unger (Dawes, Jeanelle) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 12/30 4:19 PM
Adversary case 16-01381 Complaint against Northwest Mortgage Group, Inc., Larry Unger, Robert Engelke, James Smith Second Amended (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Caleb Durling, Michael A. Rollin, Corey J Longhurst, Mara R Lieber, William A Maher, Adam M. Bialek, James N Lawlor, Maritza Dominguez Braswell, Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Identification of Agreements | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Identification of Defective Loans | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Description of Defect |