TATS, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Martin R Barash |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10018 |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 03, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | May 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2019 |
Debtor
TATS, Inc.
11150 Sepulveda Blvd Ste 2A
Mission Hills, CA 91345-1128 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
David Seror (TR)
21650 Oxnard Street, Suite 500
Woodland Hills, CA 91367 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 01/05/2017 12:02 AM PST |
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 01/04 1:22 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(1:17-bk-10018) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43981522. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 01/04 1:16 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by TATS, Inc. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/18/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/18/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 01/18/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/18/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/18/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/18/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/18/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 01/18/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 01/18/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/18/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 01/18/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/18/2017. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 01/18/2017. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 01/18/2017. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 01/18/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/18/2017. (Hagen, David) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset) (Corp POC)
Wed 01/04 1:17 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/03/2017 at 09:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. Proof of Claim due by 05/04/2017. (Hagen, David) |