Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03003
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2017
Terminated:Feb 24, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
John K Austin
Represented By
John K Austin
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
8 8 court Document Filed in Closed Case. No Action Taken. Wed 09/09 3:06 PM
Document Filed in Closed Case. No Action Taken. Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Creditor Change of Address filed by John K Austin
7 7 misc Creditor Change of Address Wed 09/09 3:06 PM
Creditor Change of Address filed by John K Austin. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2017
6 6 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Fri 02/24 10:12 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2017
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 02/23 1:21 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/06 3:29 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 ORDER
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Fri 01/06 10:14 AM
Summons and notice issued to John K Austin Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, January 05, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 01/05 1:49 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03003 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 25412929, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 01/05 11:32 AM
Adversary case 17-03003 Complaint against John K Austin filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1