Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee v. Dennemeyer & Co. LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin R Huennekens |
Case #: | 3:17-ap-03006 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Dennemeyer & Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
Adversary Proceeding Closed
Wed 02/15 8:24 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Service filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and notice issued to Dennemeyer & Co. LLC (Manley, Candace) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/05 1:49 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03006 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 25412929, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 17-03006 Complaint against Dennemeyer & Co. LLC filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |