Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Richard A Lazzara
Referred: Julie S Sneed
Case #: 8:17-cv-00016
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2017
Terminated:Mar 17, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Jul 02, 2017 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Kyung Bishop Milo
an individual 200 Executive Way, Suite 200
Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082
Represented By
Lorraine M. Hultman
Hultman, Sensenig Joshi, PA
contact info
Gail E. Farb
Williams, Parker, Harrison, Dietz & Getzen
contact info
Defendant
Stephen E. Milo
an individual 200 Executive Way, Suite 200
Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082
Represented By
Lorraine M. Hultman
Hultman, Sensenig Joshi, PA
contact info
Gail E. Farb
Williams, Parker, Harrison, Dietz & Getzen
contact info
Defendant
Vacation Rental Pros Property Management, LLC
a limited liability company 200 Executive Way, Suite 200
Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082
Represented By
Lorraine M. Hultman
Hultman, Sensenig Joshi, PA
contact info
Gail E. Farb
Williams, Parker, Harrison, Dietz & Getzen
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Ross
Represented By
Craig L. Berman
Berman Law Firm, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, June 14, 2018
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 06/14 8:43 AM
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Approval of Confidential Settlement Agreement and for Dismissal and dismissing case with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE the case in accord with the attached order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/14/2018. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 06/13 5:08 PM
Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Approval of Confidential Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice by All Defendants.(Farb, Gail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement
Monday, March 20, 2017
16 16 notice Notice of appearance Mon 03/20 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gail E. Farb on behalf of Kyung Bishop Milo, Stephen E. Milo, Vacation Rental Pros Property Management, LLC (Farb, Gail)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
15 15 order Order on motion to compel arbitration Fri 03/17 11:28 AM
ORDER ATTACHED granting 11 Defendants' Opposed Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Stay Proceedings and Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint; directing the parties to arbitrate Plaintiff's claims pursuant to the terms of the Arbitration Agreement included in the Employee Handbook; staying all proceedings in this case pending that arbitration; directing the Clerk to administratively close this case during the period of the stay; advising that Defendants will not be required to respond to the complaint until after the stay of proceedings in this case has been lifted; and further directing the Clerk to forward a hard copy of this order to the Defendants at the address provided in written Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/17/2017. (DMB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
14 14 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/15 4:18 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Motion of Attorney Lorraine M. Hultman to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants. Attorney Lorraine M. Hultman is terminated as counsel of record for Defendants. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/15/2017. (DMB)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/15 3:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Lorraine MaassHultman to withdraw as attorney for Defendant by Vacation Rental Pros Property Management, LLC. (Hultman, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2017
12 12 respm Memorandum in opposition Tue 03/14 10:28 AM
MEMORANDUM in opposition re11 Motion to compel arbitration filed by Angela Ross. (Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
11 11 motion Compel arbitration Tue 02/28 2:47 PM
MOTION to compel arbitration by All Defendants.(Hultman, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, February 23, 2017
10 10 service Summons returned executed Thu 02/23 2:19 PM
RETURN of service executed on February 7, 2017 by Angela Ross as to Vacation Rental Pros Property Management, LLC. (Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons returned executed Thu 02/23 2:18 PM
RETURN of service executed on February 7, 2017 by Angela Ross as to Stephen E. Milo. (Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons returned executed Thu 02/23 2:17 PM
RETURN of service executed on February 7, 2017 by Angela Ross as to Kyung Bishop Milo. (Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
7 7 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Fri 01/13 12:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Notice of designation of track by Angela Ross. (Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Fri 01/13 12:21 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re5 Notice of designation of track per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Angela Ross. Related case(s): no (Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
5 5 notice Notice of designation of track Thu 01/05 10:42 AM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
4 4 service Summons issued Thu 01/05 9:19 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Kyung Bishop Milo. (JNB)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Thu 01/05 9:19 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Stephen E. Milo. (JNB)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons issued Thu 01/05 9:18 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Vacation Rental Pros Property Management, LLC. (JNB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/05 9:18 AM
COMPLAINT against Kyung Bishop Milo, Stephen E. Milo, Vacation Rental Pros Property Management, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA41000) filed by Angela Ross.(JNB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet