Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Kelly Mahoney
Case #: 1:17-mc-00002
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2017
Terminated:Jan 10, 2017

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 19, 2017
13 13 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/19 12:27 PM
ORDER Condemning Funds granting12 Application to Condemn Funds. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 4/18/2017. (copy w/nef to non-ecf parties) (des)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2017
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/18 2:56 PM
MOTION re8 Writ Issued,10 Answer to Writ of Garnishment Application to Condemn Funds by Plaintiff Sunshine Heifers, LLC (Laue, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
11 11 service Writ Issued Tue 04/18 9:53 AM
WRIT of of Garnishment and Notice to Garnishee Issued in regard to Garnishee Dutchland Dairy (Laue, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2017
10 10 respoth Answer to Writ of Garnishment Mon 03/13 3:03 PM
ANSWER of Garnishee filed by Garnishee Dutchland Dairy (NEF mailed to Garnishee) (kfs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
9 9 misc Docket Annotation Tue 02/21 11:16 AM
DOCKET Annotation re7 Application for Writ of Garnishment: Application for Writ filing fee of $350.00 receipt #0862-2416515 by Nicholas Laue was captured by pay.gov on 2/16/2017. This was an erroneous fee charge. Therefore, receipt #0862-2416515 for $350.00 Application for Writ of Garnishment Filing Fee is refunded to Counsel pursuant to written request dated 2/16/2017 received by the finance department on 2/17/2017 and Clerk's approval on 2/20/2017. (ksy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Correspondence
Thursday, February 16, 2017
8 8 service Writ Issued Thu 02/16 1:07 PM
WRIT of Garnishment Issued in regard to Garnishee Dutchland Dairy RE:7 Application for Writ of Garnishment (Attachment #1 Notice of Garnishment) (Writ and Notice e-mailed to attorneys Nicholas Laue and Scott Lamoine Long) (kfs) (kfs)
Related: [-]
Att: 2 (2/16/2017) Receipt Confirmations
7 7 cmp Application for Writ of Garnishment Thu 02/16 10:04 AM
APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0862-2416515), filed by Sunshine Heifers, LLC. (Laue, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, January 30, 2017
6 6 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Mon 01/30 4:02 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Nicholas L. Laue is authorized to appear as counsel on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 01/30/2017. No conflicts identified with Judge Mahoney. (src)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2017
5 5 misc Docket Annotation Tue 01/24 11:30 AM
DOCKET Annotation: Docket Annotation: Pro Hac Vice Fee of $75.00 receipt #0862-2399082 by Scott Long captured by pay.gov on 1/17/2017 at 15:22:02. Pay.gov also captured Pro Hac Vice Fee of $75.00 receipt #0862-2399103 by Scott Long on 1/17/2017 at 15:24:58. Therefore, receipt #0862-2399103 for $75.00 Pro Hac Vice Fee is refunded to Counsel pursuant to written request dated 1/18/2017 and Clerk's Approval on 1/23/2017. re:4 MOTION for Leave to Appear ($75 receipt number 0862-2399103). (ksy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Correspondence
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
4 4 motion Appear (Pro Hac) Tue 01/17 3:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear General for Attorney Nicholas S. Laue ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2399103) by Plaintiff Sunshine Heifers, LLC (Long, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/17 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lamoine Long on behalf of Sunshine Heifers, LLC. (Long, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
2 2 misc Certification of Judgment Tue 01/10 11:11 AM
CERTIFICATION of Judgment from the District of United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin in favor of Plaintiff Sunshine Heifers, LLC against Defendants Derek D Van Asten and Kaitryn A Van Asten in the sum of $936,422.08. (src)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment
misc Fee Receipt Tue 01/10 11:02 AM
FEE Receipt: $47.00, receipt number IAN550001765 for Certification of Judgment by Sunshine Heifers, LLC. Receipt emailed to Attorney Long. (src)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
1 1 notice Notice of New Case Filing Thu 01/05 2:32 PM
NOTICE of New Case Filing by Sunshine Heifers, LLC. (pac)
Related: [-]