Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03010
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2017
Terminated:Jun 28, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Windrose Medical Properties, L.P.
Represented By
Windrose Medical Properties, L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
7 7 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 8:16 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
6 6 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 06/28 9:49 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2017
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 06/27 5:14 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/06 3:44 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 ORDER
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Fri 01/06 12:11 PM
Summons and notice issued to Windrose Medical Properties, L.P. Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, January 05, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 01/05 1:49 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03010 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 25412929, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 01/05 1:12 PM
Adversary case 17-03010 Complaint against Windrose Medical Properties, L.P. filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1