Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-03619

Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Marian F Harrison
Case #: 3:17-ap-90011
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2017
Terminated:Apr 14, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
CAR CONCEPTS LLC
120 HICKORY STREET
MADISON, TN 37115
Represented By
CAR CONCEPTS LLC
contact info
Defendant
VICKI LYNN KIMBRO
638 BRENTMEADOW CIRCLE
MADISON, TN 37115
Represented By
Rothschild & Ausbrooks, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND, III
OFFICE OF THE CHAPTER 13 TRUSTEE PO BOX 340019
NASHVILLE, TN 37203
Represented By
JAMES M DAVIS
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, April 14, 2017
18 18 court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/14 2:27 PM
Adversary Case 3:17-ap-90011 Closed . (kmw)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 25, 2017
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 03/26 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 03/25/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion for Default Judgment - AP Order
Thursday, March 23, 2017
16 16 order Default Judgment - AP Order Thu 03/23 4:32 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] against Car Concepts LLC re: 1999 Cadillac Seville BY THE COURT: Judge Marian F. Harrison (kmw)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
15 15 misc Submitted Order Wed 03/22 12:38 PM
Submitted Order Default Judgment (including plan modification) Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III Related [+]. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, February 23, 2017
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 02/24 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 02/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order to Continue Pretrial Conference
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
13 13 order Continue Pretrial Conference (No Motion) Tue 02/21 1:35 PM
Order To Continue Pretrial Conference - Rescheduling Pretrial Conference Related [+]. The Hearing date is set for 4/12/2017 at 01:15 PM at Courtroom 3, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Signed on 2/21/2017. (kmw)
Related: [-] Related Doc#:2 ,3 ,4 ,8
12 12 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 02/21 10:14 AM
ENTRY of Default by U.S. Bankruptcy Court Clerk against Car Concepts, LLC and Vicki Lynn Kimbro Related [+]. (krm)
Related: [-] related documents10 Motion for Default Judgment - AP Motion
Monday, February 20, 2017
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Mon 02/20 11:03 AM
Certificate of Service mailed on 2/21/2017 (Corrected) Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III Related [+]. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-] 5 ,7 ,8 ,10
10 10 motion Default Judgment Mon 02/20 11:01 AM
Amended Motion for Default Judgment (amended to correct notice) . If timely response hearing will be held on 3/22/2017 at 08:30 AM at Courtroom 1, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Responses due by 3/14/2017. Certificate of Service Mailed on 2/21/2017. Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III Related [+]. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-] 7
9 9 misc Submitted Order Mon 02/20 10:11 AM
Submitted Order RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III Related [+]. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 motion Continue Pretrial Conference Mon 02/20 10:08 AM
Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference Certificate of Service Mailed on 2/20/2017. Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Default Judgment Mon 02/20 9:58 AM
Motion for Default Judgment . If timely response hearing will be held on 3/22/2017 at 08:30 AM at Courtroom 1, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Responses due by 3/13/2017. Certificate of Service Mailed on 2/20/2017. Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Submitted Entry of Default (Clerk's signature) Mon 02/20 9:55 AM
Submitted Entry of Default for entry by the Clerk Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III Related [+]. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 motion Entry of Default - Clerk - AP Motion Mon 02/20 9:55 AM
Motion Requesting Entry of Default from Clerk in Adversary Proceeding. Certificate of Service Mailed on 2/20/2017. Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/11 9:11 AM
Certificate of Service mailed on 1/11/2017 on Summons Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III Related [+]. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Monday, January 09, 2017
3 3 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conf Mon 01/09 9:30 AM
Amended Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service on CAR CONCEPTS LLC ; VICKI LYNN KIMBRO Pretrial Conference scheduled 3/8/2017 at 01:15 PM at Courtroom 3, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Case judge is Marian F Harrison. Related [+]. (klp)
Related: [-] related documents2 Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conf Mon 01/09 9:23 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service on CAR CONCEPTS LLC ; VICKI LYNN KIMBRO Pretrial Conference scheduled 3/8/2017 at 01:15 PM at Courtroom 3, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Case judge is Marian F Harrison. Related [+]. (klp)
Related: [-] related documents1 Complaint
Thursday, January 05, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/05 1:57 PM
Adversary case 3:17-ap-90011. Complaint by HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III against CAR CONCEPTS LLC, VICKI LYNN KIMBRO. Fee Amount is $350.00. Filed By Trustee, Fees will be deferred. HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III. Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-3