Smith v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Carl W Hoffman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00064 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2017 1:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth M. Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 03/03 12:02 PM
Civil Case Terminated with prejudice per5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (SLD) |
||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/02 12:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal; filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth M. Smith. (Krieger, David) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order
Mon 01/09 10:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 1/9/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/06 4:54 PM
Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC re1 Complaint. (SLD) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 01/06 2:57 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Elizabeth M. Smith. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Krieger, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/06 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4426912), filed by Elizabeth M. Smith. Proof of service due by 4/6/2017.(Krieger, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Equifax | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 01/06 4:39 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (SLD) |