Daddario, Inc.
Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Magdeline D Coleman |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-10125 |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 03, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Daddario, Inc.
421 N. 7th Street 421 N. 7th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19123 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 833 Chestnut Street Suite 500
Philadelphia, PA 19107 |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 6:06 PM EDT |
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 03/03 3:26 PM
Bankruptcy Case Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (J., Randi) |
||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
court
Document
Tue 02/28 3:08 PM
Document in re: Filed by BRENDAN MCGINLEY on behalf of Daddario, Incorporated. (MCGINLEY, BRENDAN) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 02/24 1:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 02/23/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents
Tue 02/21 11:37 AM
Order Dismissing Daddario, Incorporated . Missing Documents. (J., Randi) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
Meeting of Creditors Continued (multi)
Wed 02/15 2:49 PM
Meeting of Creditors Continued. Reason for continuance: DEBTOR FAILED TO APPEAR.. (CALLAHAN, KEVIN) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
credact
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 01/31 4:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sysco Philadelphia, LLC. (Laddin, Darryl) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Notice (Praecipe) of Change of Address
Tue 01/31 12:08 PM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by J & J Sports Productions. (J., Randi) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 01/27 1:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/26/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Extend / Shorten Time
Tue 01/24 9:50 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Documents Due by 2/9/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 2/9/2017. Atty Disclosure Statement due 2/9/2017. Proper Form of Petition due 2/9/2017. Schedule A due 2/9/2017. Schedule B due 2/9/2017. Schedule D due 2/9/2017. Schedule E due 2/9/2017. Schedule F due 2/9/2017. Schedule G due 2/9/2017. Schedule H due 2/9/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 2/9/2017. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities Form B206 due 2/9/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 2/9/2017. Statement of Corporate Ownership due 2/9/2017. Corporate Resolution due 2/9/2017. Small Business Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, Federal Income Tax Return or a Statement Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared due 2/9/2017. (J., Randi) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extend / Shorten Time
Fri 01/20 12:28 PM
Motion to EXTEND time to TO FILE SCHEDULES, STATEMENTS AND RELATED DOCUMENTS Filed by Daddario, Incorporated Represented by BRENDAN MCGINLEY (Counsel). (MCGINLEY, BRENDAN) |
|
14 | 14
court
Notice of Inaccurate Filing (bk)
Fri 01/20 9:30 AM
Notice of Inaccurate Filing. In Re:13 Motion to EXTEND time to File Schedules, Statements and Related Documents Filed by Daddario, Incorporated Represented by BRENDAN MCGINLEY (Counsel).. Corrected Document due by 2/3/2017. (J., Randi) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extend / Shorten Time
Thu 01/19 4:34 PM
Motion to EXTEND time to File Schedules, Statements and Related Documents Filed by Daddario, Incorporated Represented by BRENDAN MCGINLEY (Counsel). (MCGINLEY, BRENDAN) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extend / Shorten Time
Tue 01/17 2:36 PM
Motion to Extend time to File Schedules, Statements and Related Documents Filed by Daddario, Incorporated Represented by BRENDAN MCGINLEY (Counsel). (MCGINLEY, BRENDAN) |
|
Monday, January 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 01/17 10:41 AM
***Corrected entry***Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by DEMETRIOS TSAROUHIS Filed by DEMETRIOS TSAROUHIS on behalf of Termac Corporation . (J., Randi) |
|
Att: 1 certificate of service | ||
10 | 10
misc
Creditor Request for Notices
Mon 01/16 3:09 PM
Creditor Request for Notices Filed by DEMETRIOS TSAROUHIS on behalf of Termac Corporation. (TSAROUHIS, DEMETRIOS) |
|
Att: 1 Service List | ||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 01/14 1:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Number of Notices Mailed: . No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 01/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Voluntary Petition
Fri 01/13 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Voluntary Petition. Number of Notices Mailed: . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
credact
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 01/12 12:55 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by PAMELA ELCHERT THURMOND Filed by PAMELA ELCHERT THURMOND on behalf of City of Philadelphia. (THURMOND, PAMELA) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (multi)
Wed 01/11 8:41 AM
Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/15/2017 at 02:00 PM at 833 Chestnut Street, Suite 501, Philadelphia, PA. (P., Cathy) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Requiring Documents
Tue 01/10 9:55 AM
Order Entered the debtor having failed to file or submit with the petition all of the documents required by Fed. R. Bankr.P.1007, It is hereby ORDERED that this case MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE if the documents listed are not filed by deadlines listed: Statement of Corporate Ownership due 01/23/2017. Corporate Resolution due 01/23/2017. Atty Disclosure Statement due 1/23/2017. Proper Form of Petition due 1/23/2017. Schedule A due 1/23/2017. Schedule B due 1/23/2017. Schedule D due 1/23/2017. Schedule E due 1/23/2017. Schedule F due 1/23/2017. Schedule G due 1/23/2017. Schedule H due 1/23/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 1/23/2017. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities Form B206 due 1/23/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 1/23/2017. Small Business Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, Federal Income Tax Return or a Statement Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due by 1/23/2017. Any request for an extension of time must be filed prior to the expiration of the deadlines listed. (S., Antoinette) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Tue 01/10 9:49 AM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by BRENDAN MCGINLEY on behalf of Daddario, Incorporated . (S., Antoinette) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Matrix
Tue 01/10 9:49 AM
Matrix Filed. Number of pages filed: 2, Filed by BRENDAN MCGINLEY on behalf of Daddario, Incorporated . (S., Antoinette) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 01/09 4:00 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by KEVIN P. CALLAHAN Filed by KEVIN P. CALLAHAN on behalf of United States Trustee. (CALLAHAN, KEVIN) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 01/09 12:17 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Daddario, Inc.. Government Proof of Claim Deadline: 07/8/2017. Statement of Corporate Ownership due 01/23/2017. Corporate Resolution due 01/23/2017. Chapter 11 Sm Business Plan due by 11/5/2017. (MCGINLEY, BRENDAN) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 01/09 12:41 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10125 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18260843. Fee Amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |