Emergency Training Associates, Inc.
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Michelle M Harner |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10300 |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 17, 2020 |
Debtor
Emergency Training Services, Inc.
105 Glen Hill Ct
Union Bridge, MD 21791-9227 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Mark J. Friedman
DLA Piper LLP (US) The Marbury Building 6225 Smith Avenue
Baltimore, MD 21209 |
Docket last updated: 01/09/2017 4:03 PM EST |
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Mon 01/09 1:50 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition, Resolution of Board of Directors of Emergency Training Services, Inc., Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1), Summary of Assets & Liabilities, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Scheduled E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Declaration Concerning Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Verification of the Creditor Matrix and Mailing Matrix, Fee Amount $335 Filed by Emergency Training Services, Inc.. (Stone, Andrew) Modified on 1/9/2017 (Balthrop, Barrington) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 01/09 1:51 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-10300 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00). Receipt number 29908667. Fee amount 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7
Mon 01/09 1:52 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Mark J. Friedman, with 341(a) |
|
4 | 4
court
Deficiency Notice
Mon 01/09 3:20 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: DISREGARD, THE NOTICE WAS NOT SENT TO THE BNC. THE NOTICE WAS ISSUED IN ERROR. ALL DEADLINES TERMINATED. ***Deficiency Notice . Cured Pleading due by 1/23/2017. (Balthrop, Barrington) Modified on 1/9/2017 (Balthrop, Barrington) |