Foxe, et al v. Anthony G. Ferry, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Mcmahon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00155 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:207(a) FLSA: Action for Overtime Wage Violation |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Patrick Kennelly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anthony G. Ferry, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Dennis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Duane Foxe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
Thu 09/21 3:51 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between by and betweenPlaintiff Duane Fox and Defendants Anthony G. Ferry, Inc. ("AGF"), A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc. ("AF Electrical"), and Patrick Kennelly (collectively, the "Defendants") (together "the Parties"), through their undersigned attorneys who state that they have been authorized to enter into this Stipulation, and have authorized their undersigned counsel to stipulate, consent and agree to dismiss the instant action without prejudice to Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/21/2017) (kgo) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Settlement Agreement
Wed 09/20 2:09 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Pl. Foxe stip of dismissal and corrected Cheeks letter . Document filed by Duane Foxe.(Ambinder, Lloyd) |
|
Att: 1 Stip of Dismissal -- Foxe, | ||
Att: 2 Cheeks letter (corrected) | ||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
Mon 09/11 5:33 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between by and between Plaintiff Albert Dennis and Defendants Anthony G. Ferry, Inc. ("AGF"), A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc. ("AF Electrical"), and Patrick Kennelly (collectively, the "Defendants") (together "the Parties"), through their undersigned attorneys who state that they have been authorized to enter into this Stipulation, that the Parties have agreed to amicably resolve any and all claims by Plaintiff against Defendants in this action, including claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act, 29 U.S.C. § 201 et seq., and have authorized their undersigned counsel to stipulate, consent and agree to dismiss the instant action with prejudice to Plaintiff. No attorneys' fees or costs will be awarded to any party by the Court, except as provided in the Parties' Negotiated Settlement Agreement. The terms of the Parties' Negotiated Settlement Agreement have been presented for review and approval by the Court. The Court hereby approves the settlement and dismissal of the instant action with prejudice. (Party Albert Dennis (individually and on behalf of all other persons similarly situated who were employed by Anthony G. Ferry, Inc. and A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc., all d/b/a AGF Electrical Contractors, Patrick Kennelly) terminated.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/11/2017) (ras) Modified on 9/11/2017 (ras) |
|
21 | 21
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Mon 09/11 5:28 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting20 Motion for Settlement. ENDORSEMENT: The Court approves the settlement as fair and reasonable. I have "so-ordered" the stipulation. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/11/2017) (ras) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Settlement
Fri 09/08 1:37 PM
MOTION for Settlement and 'Cheeks FLSA Approval' . Document filed by Albert Dennis.(Ambinder, Lloyd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Release, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Harris Stip of Dismissal, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Foxe Stip of Dismissal, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Billing Statements | ||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 06/20 10:41 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen McMahon: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/16/2017. Decision: Conference held. Submitted By: Connie L. Dang. (mde) |
||
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 05/17 9:37 AM
ORDER granting18 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jonathan M. Kozak dated May 16, 2017. Document filed by A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc., Anthony G. Ferry, Inc., Patrick Kennelly. Reset for June 16 @ 11:00 AM. Don't ask for another adjournment. (Initial Conference set for 6/16/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/16/2017) (rjm) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 05/16 4:43 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jonathan M. Kozak dated May 16, 2017. Document filed by A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc., Anthony G. Ferry, Inc., Patrick Kennelly.(Kozak, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 04/05 9:15 AM
ORDER granting16 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jonathan M. Kozak dated 04/04/2017. Document filed by A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc., Anthony G. Ferry, Inc., Patrick Kennelly. OK. Conference re-scheduled to 5/19/17 @ 10:00 AM. (Initial Conference set for 5/19/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/5/2017) (rjm) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 04/04 3:15 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jonathan M. Kozak dated 04/04/2017. Document filed by A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc., Anthony G. Ferry, Inc., Patrick Kennelly.(Kozak, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/13 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Marie McCloskey on behalf of A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc., Anthony G. Ferry, Inc., Patrick Kennelly. (McCloskey, Rebecca) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/13 2:16 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,. Document filed by A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc., Anthony G. Ferry, Inc., Patrick Kennelly.(Kozak, Jonathan) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/13 2:15 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc., Anthony G. Ferry, Inc..(Kozak, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 03/06 2:06 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Patrick Kennelly served on 2/23/2017, answer due 3/16/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Duane Foxe; Albert Dennis. (Ambinder, Lloyd) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 02/16 3:50 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. Answer due March 13, 2017. A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc. answer due 3/13/2017; Anthony G. Ferry, Inc. answer due 3/13/2017; Patrick Kennelly answer due 3/13/2017. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/16/2017) (kgo) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 02/16 2:18 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jonathan M. Kozak, Esq. dated 02/16/2017. Document filed by A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc., Anthony G. Ferry, Inc., Patrick Kennelly. Return Date set for 3/13/2017 at 05:00 PM.(Kozak, Jonathan) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/16 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Marc Kozak on behalf of A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc., Anthony G. Ferry, Inc., Patrick Kennelly. (Kozak, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 02/08 4:21 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/7/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/8/2017) (mro) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 01/23 5:44 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc. served on 1/12/2017, answer due 2/2/2017. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, authorized person in the Corporation Division of the Department of State. Document filed by Duane Foxe; Albert Dennis. (Ambinder, Lloyd) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 01/23 5:39 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Anthony G. Ferry, Inc. served on 1/12/2017, answer due 2/2/2017. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, authorized person in the Corporation Division of the Department of State. Document filed by Duane Foxe; Albert Dennis. (Ambinder, Lloyd) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/11 12:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jack Lee Newhouse on behalf of Albert Dennis, Duane Foxe. (Newhouse, Jack) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/10 10:07 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc., Anthony G. Ferry, Inc., Patrick Kennelly. (rch) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Tue 01/10 9:45 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lloyd Robert Ambinder. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code none;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:207;. (rch) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 01/10 10:04 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lloyd Robert Ambinder. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AGF Electrical Contractors to A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc., AGF Electrical Contractors to Anthony G. Ferry, Inc., A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc., Anthony G. Ferry, Inc., Albert Dennis, Duane Foxe, Patrick Kennelly. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (rch) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 01/10 10:09 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 01/10 10:12 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 01/10 10:14 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rch) |
||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/09 6:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony G. Ferry, Inc.; A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc.; and Patrick Kennelly, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Albert Dennis, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated, Duane Foxe, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated. (Ambinder, Lloyd) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 01/09 6:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ambinder, Lloyd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/09 6:15 PM
COMPLAINT against A. Ferry Electrical Project Management Services, Inc. d/b/a AGF Electrical Contractors, Anthony G. Ferry, Inc. d/b/a AGF Electrical Contractors, Patrick Kennelly. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13177394)Document filed by Duane Foxe, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated, Albert Dennis, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated.(Ambinder, Lloyd) |