VFS Leasing Co. v. McM, Inc. et al
North Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel M Traynor |
Referred: | Alice R Senechal |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00008 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 4:54 AM CDT |
Defendant
McM, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ron McMartin, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VFS Leasing Co.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Agassiz Excavating, Inc.
Terminated: 04/21/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago |
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
66 | 66
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 12/04 9:01 AM
ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor granting65 Motion to Dismiss. The1 Complaint is dismissed. (CK) (Main Document 66 replaced on 12/4/2023 to correct a typographical error.) Regenerated NEF. (jb) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 12/04 9:25 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jb) |