Los Gatos Bicycles, LLC
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Stephen L Johnson |
Case #: | 5:17-bk-50039 |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2018 |
Debtor
Los Gatos Bicycles, LLC
249 Copco Ln
San Jose, CA 95123-3509 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Mohamed Poonja
P.O. Box 1510
Los Altos, CA 94023 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113 |
Docket last updated: 01/10/2017 12:01 AM PST |
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Mon 01/09 4:57 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-50039 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 27086608, amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Mon 01/09 4:58 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/02/2017 at 10:00 AM at San Jose Room 130. (Vogelpohl, Jason) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Mon 01/09 4:52 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $335. Filed by Los Gatos Bicycles, LLC. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 01/23/2017. (Vogelpohl, Jason) |