Nkwain William Ngamfon v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00183 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1446 Application for Naturalization Hearing |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 2:54 AM PDT |
Defendant
Leon Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nkwain William Ngamfon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
56 | 56
judgmentCV
Judgment
Thu 10/18 9:18 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court having granted the motion for summary judgment of Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, et al. by order dated 10/17/201855 , IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (gk) |
|
55 | 55
order
Summary Judgment
Thu 10/18 9:13 AM
ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion for summary judgment46 . See document for further details. (gk) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
54 | 54
1
pgs
minutes
Motion Hearing Summary Judgment
Mon 10/15 2:30 PM
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Dolly M. Gee RE: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment46 . The Court invites counsel to respond to the tentative ruling. Following oral argument, the Court advises counsel that the motion shall be taken under submission and a written order will issue. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (gk) |