JusTours, Inc. et al v. Bogenius Group, LLC et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Carl W Hoffman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00078 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2017 2:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bogenius Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andrew Boggeri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JusTours, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Puerto Vallarta Acquisitions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 08/25 3:01 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of the Defendants and against the Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
15 | 15
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel ~Util - Terminate Case
Fri 08/25 2:58 PM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that5 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice because Plaintiffs must first comply with the arbitration requirements. The Clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Reply - Other
Fri 08/18 9:49 AM
REPLY to9 Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Plaintiffs JusTours, Inc., Puerto Vallarta Acquisitions, Inc.. (Hulet, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minord
Minute Order
Thu 08/03 3:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 8/3/2017. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs must file a surreply by August 18, 2017, not to exceed ten pages, discussing whether the parties agreed to rescind the Asset Purchase Agreement as Defendants dispute in their 9 Reply. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KES) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 03/09 10:23 AM
ORDER Granting11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Hold FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) Conference and Submit Discovery Plan. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation
Tue 03/07 3:19 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Extend Time to Hold Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference and Submit Discovery Plan Pending the Resolution of the Motion to Compel Arbitration by Defendants Bogenius Group, LLC, Andrew Boggeri. (Peterson, Tamara) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Status Report in Removal Case
Wed 02/08 10:58 AM
STATUS REPORT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendants Bogenius Group, LLC, Andrew Boggeri. (Peterson, Tamara) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 02/07 3:10 PM
REPLY to Response to5 Motion to Compel filed by Defendants Bogenius Group, LLC, Andrew Boggeri.(Peterson, Tamara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Order | ||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 01/31 1:53 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by JusTours, Inc., Puerto Vallarta Acquisitions, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Hulet, Jeffrey) |
|
7 | 7
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 01/31 1:49 PM
RESPONSE to5 Motion to Compel, filed by Plaintiffs JusTours, Inc., Puerto Vallarta Acquisitions, Inc.. Replies due by 2/7/2017. (Hulet, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Tue 01/24 3:22 PM
STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendants Bogenius Group, LLC, Andrew Boggeri.(Peterson, Tamara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Minute Order | ||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Compel
Tue 01/17 3:29 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendants Bogenius Group, LLC, Andrew Boggeri. Responses due by 1/31/2017.(Peterson, Tamara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Asset Purchase Agreement | ||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order
Tue 01/10 8:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 1/10/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
minord
Minute Order re Removal - FORM
Mon 01/09 12:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 1/9/2017. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/24/2017. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Mon 01/09 12:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Bogenius Group, LLC, Andrew Boggeri. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Peterson, Tamara) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Removal
Mon 01/09 12:04 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-16-747390-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-4428330), filed by Bogenius Group, LLC, Andrew Boggeri.(Peterson, Tamara) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Summons | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 01/09 12:48 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (ADR) |