Original Case: 1:15-cv-10138

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-01028
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2017
Terminated:Jul 26, 2017
Last checked: Thursday Jul 27, 2017 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
PROMETHEUS GLOBAL MEDIA LLC
Represented By
Jack J. Carriglio
COZEN O'CONNOR
contact info
James G. Argionis
COZEN O'CONNOR
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NICOLE BASILE
Represented By
Gregory A. Bedell
COLLINS, BARGIONE & VUCKOVICH
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/27/2017 3:30 AM CDT
Thursday, January 05, 2017
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 01/20/2017. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Nicole Basile by 01/12/2017. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/15/2017 for Nicole Basile [1] [6809469] 17-1028 (CAG)
Related: [-]