Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-16103

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:17-ap-01027
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2017
Terminated:Jan 11, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Newark Firemen Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Newark Firemen Federal Credit Union
contact info
Plaintiff
Arneida Y Greene
29 Hudson St, 2nd Floor
Newark, NJ 07103
Represented By
Bruce H Levitt
Levitt & Slafkes, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, January 11, 2018
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 01/11 2:45 PM
Adversary Case (2:17-ap-1027) Closed. (wdh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2017
court Notice of Returned Mail Mon 12/11 4:00 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Arneida Y Greene 29 Hudson St, 2nd Floor Newark, NJ 07103-2803 , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 10 Order to File Settlement Documents
Friday, November 10, 2017
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 11/11 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/10/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2017
10 10 order File Settlement Documents Wed 11/08 12:27 PM
Order to File Settlement Documents. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/8/2017 Stipulation of Settlement Deadline is 12/8/2017. (jf)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Withdrawn (Document) Thu 12/28 11:28 AM
Hearing Withdrawn, Matter marked settled Related [+] (jf)
Related: [-] 5 Joint Scheduling Order
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
9 9 misc Mediation Report Wed 05/03 4:52 PM
Mediation Report Related [+] filed by Nancy Isaacson on behalf of Nancy Isaacson. (Isaacson, Nancy)
Related: [-] 4 Mediation Order
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 04/18 2:38 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Arneida Y Greene 29 Hudson St, 2nd Floor Newark, NJ 07103-2803 , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 8 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 04/18 2:40 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Arneida Y Greene 29 Hudson St, 2nd Floor Newark, NJ 07103-2803 , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 7 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Thursday, March 30, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 03/31 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 03/31 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
6 6 misc Mediator's Acceptance of Appointment Wed 03/29 4:30 PM
Mediator's Acceptance of Appointment Related [+] filed by Nancy Isaacson on behalf of Nancy Isaacson. (Isaacson, Nancy)
Related: [-] 4 Mediation Order
Monday, March 27, 2017
5 5 order Joint Scheduling Order Tue 03/28 11:30 AM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/27/2017. Discovery due by 8/31/2017. Trial date set for 11/8/2017 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (rah)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Mediation Order Tue 03/28 11:29 AM
Mediation Order. Nancy Isaacson added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/27/2017. (rah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2017
court Hearing Held Tue 03/28 11:36 AM
Minute of Pre-Trial Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Joint Scheduling Order and Joint Mediation Order Submitted Related [+] (rah)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, February 08, 2017
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/08 5:49 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Neal M. Ruben on behalf of Newark Firemen Federal Credit Union. (Ruben, Neal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 01/10 4:58 PM
Summons Issued to Arneida Y. Greene for Service on Newark Firemen Federal Credit Union Answer due on 2/9/2017 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 3/23/2017 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (smz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Monday, January 09, 2017
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/09 4:43 PM
Adversary case 17-01027 Complaint by Arneida Y Greene against Newark Firemen Federal Credit Union. Fee Amount $ 350.. (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Levitt, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons