Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Case #: 4:17-cv-00017
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2017
Terminated:Dec 22, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2017 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Josh Kemp
Represented By
Franklin T. Coleman, IV
contact info
HAYDEN HEADLEY HOOKS
contact info
Defendant
David McCurry
326 Broad Street
Cussetta, GA 31805
Represented By
Franklin T. Coleman, IV
contact info
HAYDEN HEADLEY HOOKS
contact info
Defendant
Bo Oates
Represented By
Franklin T. Coleman, IV
contact info
HAYDEN HEADLEY HOOKS
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Smith
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
Sandi D Veliz
Represented By
Franklin T. Coleman, IV
contact info
HAYDEN HEADLEY HOOKS
contact info
Plaintiff
E D J
Represented By
DAVID S CASON
contact info
TORIN DANA TOGUT
contact info
Plaintiff
Loretta S. Jackson
Represented By
DAVID S CASON
contact info
TORIN DANA TOGUT
contact info
Plaintiff
Mr. Richard D Jackson
Represented By
DAVID S CASON
contact info
TORIN DANA TOGUT
contact info

GPO Dec 22 2017
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment and 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Final judgment is issued in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/22/17 (deb)
GPO Dec 22 2017
JUDGMENT in favor of Bo Oates, Josh Kemp, Ryan Smith, Sandi D Veliz against E D J, Loretta S. Jackson, Richard D Jackson (deb) (Main Document 40 replaced on 12/22/2017) (deb).

Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
48 48 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 09/10 11:09 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by Ryan Smith (Waymire, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
47 47 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 04/11 1:30 PM
MANDATE of USCA AFFIRMING the decision of the District Court as to41 Notice of Appeal filed by E D J, Richard D Jackson, Loretta S. Jackson(tlp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
46 46 appeal USCA Order/Opinion NOT MANDATE Tue 03/12 4:11 PM
USCA Order/Opinion as to41 Notice of Appeal filed by E D J, Richard D Jackson, Loretta S. Jackson(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
45 45 misc Taxation of Costs Tue 02/20 11:18 AM
TAXATION OF COSTS in the amount of $2,583.11 against plaintiff (tlf)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
appeal Electronic Availability of ROA Mon 02/12 10:08 AM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:41 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. Appellant did not file the transcript information form as directed (tlf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
44 44 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 01/23 10:33 AM
USCA Case Number 18-10231 EE re41 Notice of Appeal filed by E D J, Richard D Jackson, Loretta S. Jackson(tlf)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2018
43 43 misc Bill of Costs Mon 01/22 6:07 PM
BILL OF COSTS by Ryan Smith (Waymire, Jason)
Related: [-]
42 42 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 01/22 9:26 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:41 Notice of Appeal,40 Judgment,39 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Judge Appealed: Land. Court Reporter: None. Fee: Paid (tlf)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Instructions Mon 01/22 9:16 AM
Appeal Instructions re41 Notice of Appeal. The Transcript Information Form and instructions are available on the District Court website under Forms & Guides. **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 2/8/2018 (tlf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
41 41 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 01/19 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to40 Judgment,39 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by E D J, Loretta S. Jackson, Richard D Jackson. Filing fee $ 505, Receipt No.: 113G-2789324. (TOGUT, TORIN)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2017
40 40 order Judgment Fri 12/22 5:07 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Bo Oates, Josh Kemp, Ryan Smith, Sandi D Veliz against E D J, Loretta S. Jackson, Richard D Jackson (deb) (Main Document 40 replaced on 12/22/2017) (deb)
Related: [-]
39 39 32 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 12/22 4:52 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Summary Judgment and19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Final judgment is issued in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/22/17 (deb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2017
38 38 misc Letter Tue 10/24 5:45 PM
Letter regarding erroneous filing of Doc. 36. re37 Reply to Response to Motion (Coleman, Franklin)
Related: [-]
37 37 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 10/24 5:38 PM
REPLY to Response filed by David McCurry re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Coleman, Franklin)
Related: [-]
36 36 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 10/24 5:33 PM
REPLY to Response filed by David McCurry re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Coleman, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
35 35 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 10/17 11:49 AM
REPLY to Response filed by Ryan Smith re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Waymire, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
34 34 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/10 2:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by E D J, Loretta S. Jackson, Richard D Jackson re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (TOGUT, TORIN)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Response to Motion Tue 10/10 2:32 PM
RESPONSE filed by E D J, Loretta S. Jackson, Richard D Jackson re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment(TOGUT, TORIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stmt of Material Facts Resp Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Dispute
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 10/10 3:35 PM
Notice of Deficiency; No need to re-file ; Related documents:34 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by E D J, Richard D Jackson, Loretta S. Jackson,33 Response to Motion filed by E D J, Richard D Jackson, Loretta S. Jackson); Documents should not have been filed separately. The CM/ECF procedures manual provides as follows: " A docket entry for a response to motion for summary judgment should look as follows:[#]Response Brief to [#] Motion for Summary Judgment; Attachment 1; Response to Statement of Undisputed Material Facts; Attachment 2Statement of Disputed Material Facts; Attachment 3 - Affidavit of Mary Jones; Exhibit List; Attachment 4 Exhibit A Letter from A. Hamilton to A. Burr; Attachment Exhibit B Letter from A. Adams to J. Adams." Please bear in mind for future filings. Future deficiencies may result in the need to re-file (tlf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2017
32 32 discov Certificate of Need to File Discovery Thu 10/05 9:12 AM
Certificate of Need to File Discovery by E D J, Loretta S. Jackson, Richard D Jackson. Related document:17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ryan Smith,19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David McCurry.(TOGUT, TORIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition of David McCurry,
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit of David McCurry,
Att: 3 Exhibit Deposition of Sandi Veliz,
Att: 4 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit of Sandi Veliz,
Att: 5 Exhibit Deposition of Bo Oates,
Att: 6 Exhibit Deposiiton Exhbiits of Bo Oates,
Att: 7 Exhibit Deposiiton of Josh Kemp,
Att: 8 Exhibit Deposiiton Exhbiits of Josh Kemp,
Att: 9 Exhibit Deposiiton of Ryan Smith,
Att: 10 Exhibit Deposition Exhibits of Ryan Smith
Wednesday, October 04, 2017
31 31 discov Request for Opposing Counsel to File Original Discovery Wed 10/04 5:27 PM
SECOND notice of deficiency sent regarding this filing with instructions that it must be re-filed . It is suggested that attorney call the clerk's office for instructions on correctly filing this document. Request to All Plaintiffs to file original discovery document(s) by Richard D Jackson, E D J, Loretta S. Jackson.(TOGUT, TORIN) Modified on 10/4/2017 (tlf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition of David McCurry,
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposiiton of Sandi Veliz,
Att: 3 Exhibit Deposition of Bo Oates,
Att: 4 Exhibit Deposition of Josh Kemp,
Att: 5 Exhibit Deposition of Ryan Smith
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 10/04 2:05 PM
Notice of Deficiency entered for this document with instructions that it be re-filed . REPLY to Response filed by E D J, Loretta S. Jackson, Richard D Jackson re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment,19 MOTION for Summary Judgment(TOGUT, TORIN) Modified on 10/4/2017 (tlf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition of Josh Kemp,
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposition of Ryan Smith,
Att: 3 Exhibit Depsotion of David McCurry,
Att: 4 Exhibit Deposition of Sandi Veliz,
Att: 5 Exhibit Deposition of Bo Oates
29 29 respm Response to Motion Wed 10/04 1:52 PM
RESPONSE filed by E D J, Loretta S. Jackson, Richard D Jackson re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment,19 MOTION for Summary Judgment(TOGUT, TORIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stmt of Material Facts Resp Plaintiff's Statement of Disputed Facts in Opposiiton to Smith's Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact Not in Dispute,
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposiiton Exhibit of Ryan Smith
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 10/04 3:25 PM
Notice of Deficiency; Document must be re-filed ; Related document:30 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by E D J, Richard D Jackson, Loretta S. Jackson; Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Civil Events, Other Filings, Discovery Documents, Certificate of Need to File Discovery (tlf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 10/04 5:47 PM
Notice of Deficiency; Document must be re-filed ; Related document:31 Request for Opposing Counsel to File Original Discovery, filed by E D J, Richard D Jackson, Loretta S. Jackson Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Civil Events, Other Filings, Discovery Documents, Certificate of Need to File Discovery The attached document is neither a reply to response to motion, nor a request for opposing counsel to file discovery. THE CORRECT EVENT IS CIVIL EVENTS, OTHER FILINGS, DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS, CERTIFICATE OF NEED TO FILE DISCOVERY (tlf)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2017
28 28 discov Deposition Fri 09/22 4:39 PM
DEPOSITION of Ryan Smith taken on May 30, 2017 filed by David McCurry. Related document:20 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by David McCurry,17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ryan Smith,19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David McCurry.(Coleman, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 1
27 27 discov Deposition Fri 09/22 4:36 PM
DEPOSITION of Bo Oates taken on May 30, 2017 filed by Bo Oates. Related document:20 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by David McCurry,17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ryan Smith,19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David McCurry.(Coleman, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 1
26 26 discov Deposition Fri 09/22 4:34 PM
DEPOSITION of Joshua Kemp taken on May 30, 2017 filed by Josh Kemp. Related document:20 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by David McCurry,17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ryan Smith,19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David McCurry.(Coleman, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 1
25 25 discov Deposition Fri 09/22 4:30 PM
DEPOSITION of Sandi Veliz taken on May 30, 2017 filed by Sandi D Veliz. Related document:20 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by David McCurry,17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ryan Smith,19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David McCurry.(Coleman, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition Exhibits 1-9
24 24 discov Deposition Fri 09/22 4:18 PM
DEPOSITION of David McCurry taken on May 30, 2017 filed by David McCurry. Related document:20 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by David McCurry,17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ryan Smith,19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David McCurry.(Coleman, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition Exhibits 1-7
23 23 discov Deposition Fri 09/22 4:12 PM
DEPOSITION of Erica Jackson taken on May 10, 2017 filed by David McCurry. Related document:20 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by David McCurry,17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ryan Smith,19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David McCurry.(Coleman, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition Exhibits 1-4
22 22 discov Deposition Fri 09/22 4:05 PM
DEPOSITION of Loretta Jackson taken on May 10, 2017 filed by David McCurry. Related document:20 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by David McCurry,17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ryan Smith,19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David McCurry.(Coleman, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition Exhibits 1-4
21 21 discov Deposition Fri 09/22 3:58 PM
DEPOSITION of Richard Jackson taken on May 10, 2017 filed by David McCurry. Related document:20 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by David McCurry,17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ryan Smith,19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David McCurry.(Coleman, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition Exhibits 1-4
20 20 discov Certificate of Need to File Discovery Fri 09/22 3:51 PM
Certificate of Need to File Discovery Depositions by David McCurry. Related document:17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ryan Smith,19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David McCurry.(Coleman, Franklin)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Summary Judgment Fri 09/22 3:49 PM
FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment by David McCurry filed by Franklin T. Coleman, IV.(Coleman, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts Motion for Summary Judgment
Friday, September 15, 2017
18 18 discov Request for Opposing Counsel to File Original Discovery Fri 09/15 2:01 PM
Request to All Parties to file original discovery document(s) by Ryan Smith.(Waymire, Jason)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Summary Judgment Fri 09/15 1:59 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ryan Smith filed by Jason C. Waymire.(Waymire, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts
Tuesday, March 14, 2017
misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Tue 03/14 10:50 AM
Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by DAVID S CASON. (nop)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
16 16 order Scheduling/Discovery Order Wed 03/08 5:35 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER :Discovery to be complete by 8/8/2017. Dispositive motions due by 9/22/2017. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 3/8/2017. (esl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2017
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/08 1:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by E D J, Loretta S. Jackson, Richard D Jackson (TOGUT, TORIN)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order - Rules 16/26 Wed 02/08 10:43 AM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 3/27/2017. Corporate Disclosures due by 2/22/2017. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 2/8/2017. (tlp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/07 11:09 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Josh Kemp, David McCurry, Bo Oates, Sandi D Veliz.(HOOKS, HAYDEN)Attorney HAYDEN HEADLEY HOOKS added to party Josh Kemp(pty:dft), Attorney HAYDEN HEADLEY HOOKS added to party David McCurry(pty:dft), Attorney HAYDEN HEADLEY HOOKS added to party Bo Oates(pty:dft), Attorney HAYDEN HEADLEY HOOKS added to party Sandi D Veliz(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/07 9:24 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ryan Smith.(Waymire, Jason)Attorney Jason C. Waymire added to party Ryan Smith(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2017
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/03 12:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard D Jackson, E D J, Loretta S. Jackson as to All Plaintiffs. (TOGUT, TORIN)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/03 12:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard D Jackson, E D J, Loretta S. Jackson as to All Plaintiffs. (TOGUT, TORIN)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/03 12:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard D Jackson, E D J, Loretta S. Jackson as to All Plaintiffs. (TOGUT, TORIN)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/03 12:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard D Jackson, E D J, Loretta S. Jackson as to All Plaintiffs. (TOGUT, TORIN)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/03 12:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard D Jackson, E D J, Loretta S. Jackson as to All Plaintiffs. (TOGUT, TORIN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
notice Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement Tue 01/31 4:52 PM
REMINDER NOTICE TO COUNSEL DAVID S CASON - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (nop)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 01/10 3:39 PM
Summons issued as to Sandi D. Veliz (tlf)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 01/10 3:38 PM
Summons issued as to Ryan Smith (tlf)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 01/10 3:37 PM
Summons issued as to Bo Oates (tlf)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/10 3:35 PM
Summons issued as to David McCurry (tlf)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 01/10 3:34 PM
Summons issued as to Josh Kemp (tlf)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Complaint Tue 01/10 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT against David McCurry Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2510857, $400 filed by Richard D Jackson(TOGUT, TORIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons
notice Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement Tue 01/10 3:33 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL DAVID S. CASON - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled (tlf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 01/10 3:49 PM
Notice of Deficiency; No need to re-file ; Related document:1 Complaint; Exhibits should be completely identified. The CM/ECF procedures provide as follows: " A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. The description must be of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court. " . A user message during the filing of this event, echoed these instructions. Additionally, the Attorney case opening guide provided that parties should have been added in all caps. Please bear this in mind when opening future cases or filing other documents. Deficiency notices may be issued in the future requiring re-filing (tlf)
Related: [-]