Rodriguez v. The City Of New York , et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Laura Taylor Swain |
Referred: | Barbara C Moses |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00184 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2017 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Police Officers John Doe 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Det. Larry Maraj
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City Of New York ,
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anita Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Endorsed Letter
Wed 10/18 4:02 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Ms. Anita Rodriguezfrom Judge Laura Taylor Swain dated 10/17/2017 re: I have received your October 11, 2017, letter regarding the settlement payment in your case. The settlement agreement filed with the Court provided for a $10,000 settlement amount, rather than the $35,000 amount mentioned in your letter. I have enclosed a copy of the order of dismissal and the agreement. You may wish to follow up with your lawyer regarding any questions. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/17/2017) Copies Sent By Chambers. (rjm) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Wed 10/18 2:19 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Mrs. Anita Rodriguez dated 10/11/2017 re: Plaintiff writes to inform the Court that when I had the conference I was told that I would Receive 35,000.00 Dollars for the case 17-cv-00184, I am not understanding why I only Received a check from the Lawyers Office of Cohen & Fitch LLP of 6,278.74 Dollars and was charged for parking tickets I had paid for I feel that there is something wrong with this case and are asking for your help to find out exalt. What happen because something is not right? I would appreciate if you would please help me. My home address is on the letter and my home number is (347) 851-2009 thank you your honor for taking your time to help me. Document filed by Anita Rodriguez.(js) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
Thu 08/03 1:55 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that The above-referenced action is hereby dismissed with prejudice; and notwithstanding the dismissal of this action in accordance with this agreement, the District Court shall continue to retain jurisdiction over this action for the purpose of enforcing the terms of the settlement agreement reached between the parties and set forth in the Stipulation of Settlement executed by the parties in this matter. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/2/2017) (ap) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/12 6:13 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/12/2017) (jwh) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Thu 06/08 2:58 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Ilyssa S. Fuchs dated 06/08/2017 re: Request for Initial Conference. Document filed by Anita Rodriguez.(Fuchs, Ilyssa) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
adr
Mediator Session Scheduled
Thu 05/11 9:56 AM
MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 5/31/2017, 9:30 AM at the U.S. Courthouse located at 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007.(cda) |
||
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
adr
Notice of Mediator Assignment
Wed 04/12 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator.(cda) |
||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
adr
Section 1983 Plan 100-Day Review
Fri 03/31 9:59 AM
LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) 100-DAY REVIEW: The mediator shall be available to the parties throughout the discovery phase of the Rule and shall schedule and hold the first mediation session in the case within ten (10) days of the close of the discovery period. In the event that the mediation cannot begin within the time set forth herein, the assigned mediator shall promptly notify the Mediation Supervisor of the date by which the mediation will begin and the reason for the delay. The mediator shall correspond with the Mediation Office to arrange a mutually convenient date and time to hold the first session. 1983-Plan Review due by 7/10/2017. Mediator to be Assigned by 4/10/2017.(mf) |
||
adr
Notice of Selection for Mediation
Fri 03/31 9:59 AM
NOTICE OF SELECTION FOR MEDIATION: This case has been selected for participation in the Southern District of New York's mediation program.(mf) |
||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/30 11:49 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Larry Maraj(Shield No. 4810, In his Official Capacity), The City Of New York,.(Stein, Matthew) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Fri 01/27 6:15 PM
PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER FOR CASES SUBJECT TO S.D.N.Y. LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (§ 1983 PLAN): Initial Conference set for 7/28/2017 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 12D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/27/2017) (cla) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 01/26 3:19 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Larry Maraj(Shield No. 4810, In his Official Capacity) served on 1/25/2017, answer due 2/15/2017; Larry Maraj(Shield No. 4810, Individually) served on 1/25/2017, answer due 2/15/2017. Service was accepted by Detective "John" Garis, Co-Worker. Document filed by Anita Rodriguez. (Fuchs, Ilyssa) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/18 5:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Stein on behalf of The City Of New York,. (Stein, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 01/11 4:39 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. The City Of New York, served on 1/11/2017, answer due 2/1/2017. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Legal Clerk Authorized to Accept. Document filed by Anita Rodriguez. (Fuchs, Ilyssa) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice of Participation in Section 1983 Plan
Wed 01/11 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/11 9:30 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Larry Maraj(Shield No. 4810, In his Official Capacity), Larry Maraj(Shield No. 4810, Individually), The City Of New York. (kl) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 01/11 9:25 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (kl) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 01/11 9:26 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. (kl) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 01/11 9:26 AM
Case Designated ECF. (kl) |
||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 01/10 5:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY OF NEW YORK, DET. LARRY MARAJ, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Anita Rodriguez. (Fuchs, Ilyssa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 01/10 5:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fuchs, Ilyssa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/10 5:09 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe 1-10, John Doe 1-10, Larry Maraj(Shield No. 4810, In his Official Capacity), Larry Maraj(Shield No. 4810, Individually), The City Of New York,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13182248)Document filed by Anita Rodriguez.(Fuchs, Ilyssa) |