Michael S. Pederson et al v. Citibank, N.A.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Donato |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00114 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:405 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2017 1:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Citibank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maureen E Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael S Pederson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 05/10 3:04 PM
Order by Judge James Donato granting 41 Stipulation of Dismissal. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 05/04 11:12 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiffs Michael S. Pederson and Maureen E. Griffin with Prejudice) filed by Citibank.(Bogo-Ernst, Debra) (Filed on 5/4/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
adr
Certification of ADR Session
Thu 12/14 8:33 AM
Certification of ADR Session by Mediator Robert Hawk: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held a Mediation session on 12/13/2017. The case settled. Mediation is complete. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 11/09 11:36 AM
Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 12/13/2017 10:00 AM., at Hogan Lovells US LLP4085 Campbell Ave., Menlo Park, CA 94025. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2017) |
||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
adr
Pre MED phone conference
Mon 10/30 8:32 AM
Pre MED phone conference scheduled on Monday, October 30, 2017, at 10:00 AM. Mediator provided dial-in information to parties. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Modified on 10/30/2017 (af, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Statement
Thu 10/19 3:57 PM
Statement INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Maureen E Griffin, Michael S Pederson. (Boasberg, Albert) (Filed on 10/19/2017) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order
Fri 10/06 4:32 PM
ORDER re 34 Letter filed by Citibank, 36 Letter filed by Maureen E Griffin, Michael S Pederson. At the parties' joint request, the Court extends the mediation deadline to December 29, 2017. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/6/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Letter
Fri 09/29 3:38 PM
Letter from Albert L. Boasberg, Esq. . (Boasberg, Albert) (Filed on 9/29/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order
Thu 09/21 3:13 PM
ORDER. Plaintiffs are directed to file a response to defendant's 34 discovery dispute letter by September 29, 2017. The response should not exceed three pages and should otherwise comply with the Court's Standing Order for Civil Discovery. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/21/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Letter
Fri 09/15 4:55 PM
Letter from Debra Bogo-Ernst to Hon. Judge Donato with exhibits A-D . (Bogo-Ernst, Debra) (Filed on 9/15/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
adr
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held
Thu 09/14 11:45 AM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard Herman on September 14, 2017. Plaintiff's counsel failed to appear for the 11:30 call. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
Mon 09/11 11:26 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, September 14, 2017, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
Mon 08/07 12:59 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Robert Hawk as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Stipulation selecting Mediation
Fri 05/26 7:14 PM
Order by Hon. James Donato granting 24 Stipulation selecting Mediation. The parties are ordered to complete mediation by September 30, 2017, as stipulated. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017) |
|
29 | 29
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Fri 05/26 7:12 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/6/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Pretrial Conference set for 7/19/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2017. Discovery due by 2/28/2018. Motions due by 3/1/2018. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/26/2017. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Tue 04/25 12:12 PM
ORDER. The Court vacates the case management conference that was set for April 27, 2017, and will issue a scheduling order. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/25/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Case Management Statement
Mon 04/24 4:08 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Citibank, N.A..(Bogo-Ernst, Debra) (Filed on 4/24/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Counsel of Record for All Parties | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Mon 04/24 12:09 PM
ORDER. The parties failed to file a case management conference statement by the April 20, 2017 filing deadline. The stipulated request to continue the case management conference (Dkt. No. 21) did not discharge that obligation. The parties are directed to file a joint case management statement by no later than 6 p.m. on Tuesday, April 25, 2017. After reviewing that statement, the Court will either continue or vacate the CMC that was set for April 27, 2017. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/24/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Fri 04/21 4:43 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bogo-Ernst, Debra) (Filed on 4/21/2017) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation
Fri 04/21 4:42 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Citibank, N.A. filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Bogo-Ernst, Debra) (Filed on 4/21/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/19 10:13 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Debra Bogo-Ernst. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/19 10:12 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Bornhorst.. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 04/17 6:13 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re14 Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Citibank, N.A..(Edelstein, Andrew) (Filed on 4/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/13 4:18 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11313932.) filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Bornhorst, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/13 4:13 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11313872.) filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Bogo-Ernst, Debra) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/13 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst (Bogo-Ernst, Debra) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice
Wed 04/12 9:45 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Wed 03/29 5:44 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Citibank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Citicorp, Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc. for Citibank, N.A.. (Edelstein, Andrew) (Filed on 3/29/2017) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/29 5:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint byCitibank, N.A.. (Edelstein, Andrew) (Filed on 3/29/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Wed 03/15 3:38 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2017.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/15/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2017) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/15 12:08 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/15/17.(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
Wed 03/15 9:49 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/14 4:29 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Citibank, N.A... (Edelstein, Andrew) (Filed on 3/14/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Wed 03/01 8:02 AM
ORDER GRANTING 8 Stipulation to Set Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Citibank, N.A.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/1/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 02/28 7:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Citibank shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 3/14/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/14/2017. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Mon 02/27 7:48 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, to Set Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Edelstein, Andrew) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 02/14 9:24 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maureen E Griffin, Michael S Pederson re5 Summons Issued (Boasberg, Albert) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 01/25 2:47 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Maureen E Griffin, Michael S Pederson.. (Boasberg, Albert) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/10 8:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Citibank, N.A.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 01/10 8:13 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 01/10 3:21 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/24/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 01/10 2:13 PM
Proposed Summons. (Boasberg, Albert) (Filed on 1/10/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/10 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT for Money; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-11063235.). Filed by Michael S Pederson, Maureen E Griffin.(Boasberg, Albert) (Filed on 1/10/2017) Modified on 1/10/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |