|
GPO
Apr 25 2017
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Samantha West, Chris Azpeitia, Eileen Foster, Antonio Garcia. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
|
|
GPO
Apr 28 2017
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re: Second Amended Complaint filed by Samantha West, Chris Azpeitia, Eileen Foster, Antonio Garcia. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
|
|
GPO
Jul 21 2017
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
|
|
GPO
Sep 14 2017
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND APPOINTING INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting (49) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:17-cv-00123-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
|
|
GPO
Mar 05 2018
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (60 in 3:17-cv-00123-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Stipulated Protective Order filed by Jon Valliere, Samantha West, Eileen Foster, Jinetra Bonner, Antonio Garcia. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 20, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
|
|
GPO
Mar 27 2018
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Class Certification Motion Deadlines filed by Jon Valliere, Samantha West, Eileen Foster, Antonio Garcia. Motion for class certification due by 6/29/2018. Responses due 7/27/2018. Replies due 8/17/2018. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 26, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
|
|
GPO
Apr 30 2018
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Class Certification Motion Deadlines filed by Jon Valliere, Samantha West, Eileen Foster, Antonio Garcia. Motions due by 9/24/2018. Responses due by 10/22/2018. Replies due by 11/12/2018. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 30, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
|
|
GPO
Aug 20 2018
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Class Certification Deadlines; Declaration of Joshua F. Young in Support Thereof filed by Jon Valliere, Samantha West, Chris Azpeitia, Eileen Foster, Antonio Garcia. Motion for Class Certification due by 11/26/2018. Responses due by 1/18/2019. Replies due by 2/8/2019. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 20, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
|
|
GPO
Jan 09 2019
, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019)STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO FILE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Jon Valliere, Samantha West, Eileen Foster, Jinetra Bonner, Antonio Garcia. Preliminary Approval Motion due by 2/13/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 9, 2019. (wsn
|
|
GPO
Feb 14 2019
14/2019)STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL DEADLINE; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF (CIVIL L.R. 6-1 AND 6-2) filed by Jon Valliere, Samantha West, Eileen Foster, Jinetra Bonner, Antonio Garcia. Motion due by 3/13/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 14, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/
|
|
GPO
Mar 13 2019
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL DEADLINE; DECLARATION (CIVIL L.R. 6-1 AND 6-2) filed by Jon Valliere, Samantha West, Eileen Foster, Antonio Garcia Motion for Preliminary Approval due by 4/3/2019. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 13, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
|
|
GPO
Apr 03 2019
snS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)STIPULATION AND ORDER re 83 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO FURTHER EXTEND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL DEADLINE; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF (CIVIL L.R. 6-1 AND 6-2) filed by Jon Valliere, Samantha West, Eileen Foster, Jinetra Bonner, Antonio Garcia. Motion for Preliminary Approval due by 4/24/2019. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 3, 2019. (w
|
|
GPO
Apr 25 2019
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 85 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO FURTHER EXTEND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL DEADLINE; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF (CIVIL L.R. 6-1 AND 6-2) filed by Jon Valliere, Samantha West, Eileen Foster, Jinetra Bonner, Antonio Garcia. Motion for Preliminary Approval due by 5/8/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 25, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
|
|
GPO
May 07 2019
ia. Amended Pleadings due by 5/8/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 7, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST IN PART re 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Leave to File First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Jon Valliere, Samantha West, Eileen Foster, Jinetra Bonner, Antonio Garc
|