Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. v. LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 5112
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | James C Mahan |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00084 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2017 2:16 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 5112
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 5112
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 27, 2020 | ||
95 | 95
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Mon 07/27 2:47 PM
ORDER granting94 Motion to Substitute Attorney Joseph Hong for Attorney Michael N. Beede. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/27/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
94 | 94
motion
Motion Substitute Attorney
Fri 07/24 11:45 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph Y. Hong in for Attorney Michael Beede by Defendant LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 5112. (Hong, Joseph) |