Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-10134

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jerry A Brown
Case #: 2:17-ap-01005
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2017
Terminated:Jan 10, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rhonda Brown
7542 Lafourche Street
New Orleans, LA 70127
Represented By
Rhonda Brown
contact info
Plaintiff
Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee
3027 Ridgelake Drive
Metairie, LA 70002
Represented By
Albert J. Derbes, IV
The Derbes Law Firm, L.L.C.
contact info
Kaja Stamnes Elmer
The Derbes Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, January 10, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/10 3:43 PM
Adversary Case Closed 2:17-ap-1005. (Waker, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2017
27 27 court Memo to Record Fri 09/08 10:39 AM
Memo to Record of hearing held 9/8/17 Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)22 Motion for Judgment Debtor Examination filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee) Present: Bryan Jules ONeill, representing Wilbur J. Babin, Jr., Plaintiff; Lawrence Galle, representing Rhonda Brown, Defendant; and Rhonda Brown, Defendant. The motion for judgment debtor exam was granted, the defendant was sworn in and the exam took place outside the courtroom. (Matrana, L
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
26 26 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/06 2:22 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)22 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee,24 Generic Order) (O'Neill, Bryan
Friday, August 18, 2017
25 25 miscap Certificate of Service Fri 08/18 8:51 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)24 Generic Order) (O'Neill, Bryan
Thursday, August 17, 2017
24 24 order Generic Motion Thu 08/17 4:56 PM
Order Granting Motion for Judgment Debtor Examination IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 8/17/17. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 22 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee
23 23 miscap Certificate of Service Thu 08/17 9:48 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)22 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee) (O'Neill, Bryan
22 22 motion zGeneric Motion Thu 08/17 9:41 AM
Ex Parte Motion for Judgment Debtor Examination Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee (O'Neill, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
21 21 miscap Certificate of Service Tue 05/30 10:06 AM
Certificate of Service for Judgment Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee (O'Neill, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2017
20 20 order Judgment Fri 05/26 10:10 AM
Judgment IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on May 26, 2017 Related [+] (Donelon, G)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Rhonda Brown,9 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee,12 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee
Monday, May 22, 2017
19 19 court Memo to Record Mon 05/22 3:39 PM
Memo to Record of hearing held 5/18/18. Considering the statements of counsel, proper notice having been given and no objections having been filed, the Court will Grant the Motion for Summary Judgment. Counsel is to submit the order within 2 days. Upon entry of the Order, the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings will be Moot. RE: Related [+] (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee,12 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee
Thursday, May 18, 2017
18 18 miscap Certificate of Service Thu 05/18 10:36 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)17 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney) (O'Neill, Bryan
17 17 order Withdraw As Attorney Thu 05/18 8:32 AM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney Terminated Attorney Kaja Stamnes Elmer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on May 18, 2017. (Donelon, G)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
16 16 miscap Certificate of Service Wed 05/17 10:09 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee) (O'Neill, Bryan
15 15 motion Withdraw As Attorney (Motion) Wed 05/17 10:04 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee (O'Neill, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
14 14 miscap Certificate of Service Thu 04/27 1:20 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)9 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee,10 Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee,11 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee,12 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee,13 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee) (Derbes, Albert
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 04/27 7:59 AM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)12 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee) Hearing scheduled for 5/18/2017 at 10:30 AM at 500 Poydras Street, Suite B-705 SECTION B . (Derbes, Albert
12 12 motion zGeneric Motion Thu 04/27 7:57 AM
Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings with Incorporated Memorandum Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee (Derbes, Albert)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 04/27 7:50 AM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)9 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee,10 Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee) Hearing scheduled for 5/18/2017 at 10:30 AM at 500 Poydras Street, Suite B-705 SECTION B . (Derbes, Albert
10 10 miscap Memorandum Thu 04/27 7:42 AM
Memorandum in Re Motion for Summary Judgment . Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)9 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee) (Derbes, Albert
9 9 motion Summary Judgment - Motion Thu 04/27 7:39 AM
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee (Derbes, Albert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 04/05 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)7 Order to Set Trial) Notice Date 04/05/2017. (Admin.
Monday, April 03, 2017
7 7 order Set Trial Mon 04/03 4:27 PM
Order Setting Trial Signed on April 3, 2017 Trial scheduled for 6/29/2017 at 10:00 AM at 500 Poydras Street, Suite B-705 SECTION B . Pre-Trial Order due by 6/22/2017. (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 03/22 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)5 Rule 16b Conference and Pre-Trial Conference) Notice Date 03/22/2017. (Admin.
Monday, March 20, 2017
5 5 court Rule 16b Conference and Pre-Trial Conference Mon 03/20 2:00 PM
Notice of Rule 16(b) Conference and Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 4/3/2017 at 02:45 PM at Hale Boggs Federal Building, Room B-741A, 500 Poydras Street. (Matrana, L)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2017
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/13 10:12 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Rhonda Brown (Whyte, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 01/12 10:59 AM
Summons Service Executed on Rhonda Brown 1/12/2017 . (Elmer, Kaja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 01/11 3:06 PM
Summons Issued on Rhonda Brown Answer Due 2/10/2017. (Donelon, G)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/11 12:13 PM
Adversary case 17-01005 Complaint by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee against Rhonda Brown. Fee Amount $350. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Derbes, Albert)
Related: [-]