Babin, Jr. Trustee v. Clouden
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-10134
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-10134
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:17-ap-01006 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Ida Clouden
1116 31st Street
Kenner, LA 70065 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee
3027 Ridgelake Drive
Metairie, LA 70002 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:07 PM CDT |
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 01/10 3:43 PM
Adversary Case Closed 2:17-ap-1006. (Waker, K.) |
||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
court
Memo to Record
Fri 08/04 11:48 AM
Memo to Record of hearing held 8/4/17 |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee |
|
24 | 24
![]() Order to Appear and Show Cause against Ida Clouden failure to appear Signed on June 28, 2017 Show Cause hearing to be held on 8/4/2017 at 10:00 AM at 500 Poydras Street, Suite B-705 SECTION B . (Donelon, G) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee |
|
22 | 22
![]() Motion For Contempt Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee (O'Neill, Bryan) |
|
21 | 21
court
Memo to Record
Tue 06/27 1:41 PM
Memo to Record of hearing scheduled for 7/10/1 |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
Memo to Record
Mon 06/26 10:59 AM
Memo to Record of hearing held 6/26/17 |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee |
|
18 | 18
![]() Order Granting Motion for Judgment Debtor Examination. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on June 5, 2017. (Nunnery, J.) Examination set for 6/26/17 at 10:30 AM. Modified to add hearing info on 6/5/2017 (Nunnery, J.) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee |
|
16 | 16
![]() Ex Parte Motion for Judgment Debtor Examination Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee (Derbes, Albert) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee |
|
14 | 14
![]() Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney Terminated Attorney Kaja Stamnes Elmer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on May 18, 2017. (Donelon, G) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee |
|
12 | 12
![]() Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee (O'Neill, Bryan) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Administrative Correction to and for BNC Noticing |
|
9 | 9
![]() Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Signed on April 10, 2017. (Nunnery, J.) Modified to edit text on 4/10/2017 (Nunnery, J.) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee |
|
7 | 7
![]() Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee (Elmer, Kaja) |
|
Sunday, February 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Clerk's Entry of Defaul . (Donelon, G) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee (Elmer, Kaja) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Service Executed on Ida Clouden 1/12/2017 . (Elmer, Kaja) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Ida Clouden Answer Due 2/10/2017. (Donelon, G) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 17-01006 Complaint by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee against Ida Clouden. Fee Amount $350. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Derbes, Albert) |