Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Eduardo C Robreno
Case #: 2:13-cv-06933
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2013
Terminated:Feb 10, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Jan 22, 2015 11:08 PM EST
Defendant
AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION
Represented By
MEREDITH S. AUTEN
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
ERIC W. SITARCHUK
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
VICTORIA W. HOLLINGER
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
THOMAS J. SULLIVAN
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Defendant
AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Represented By
MEREDITH S. AUTEN
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
ERIC W. SITARCHUK
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
VICTORIA W. HOLLINGER
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
THOMAS J. SULLIVAN
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Plaintiff
COMPLIANT PHARMACY ALLIANCE COOPERATIVE
Represented By
NICHOLAS GRAVANTE, JR.
Bois Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
KAREN A. CHESLEY
contact info
MICHAEL D. DONOVAN
Donovan Axler LLC
contact info
LUKE NIKAS
Bois, Schiller & Flexner, LLP
contact info
ROBERT A. MAGNANINI
Stone & Magnanini LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LACEY DRUG COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
NICHOLAS GRAVANTE, JR.
Bois Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
KAREN A. CHESLEY
contact info
MICHAEL D. DONOVAN
Donovan Axler LLC
contact info
LUKE NIKAS
Bois, Schiller & Flexner, LLP
contact info
ROBERT A. MAGNANINI
Stone & Magnanini LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Friday, February 28, 2020
52 52 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Mon 03/02 9:07 AM
ORDERED THAT THE SEAL SHALL BE MAINTAINED ON DOCUMENTS CURRENTLY FILED UNDER SEAL IN THIS MATTER FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN UNTIL FEBRUARY 28, 20205. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/28/20.3/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
51 51 motion Seal Thu 02/27 6:03 PM
Joint MOTION to Seal and for Extension of Sealing Order filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(AUTEN, MEREDITH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Sealing Order,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order