Amaya v. Frauenheim
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Nandor J Vadas |
Referred: | Pslc Agb |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00108 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2017 |
Petitioner
Alexis Joel Amaya
|
|
Respondent
Scott Frauenheim
|
GPO
Feb 28 2017
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/28/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/07 10:35 AM
NOTICE Of Decision From The State Supreme Court by Alexis Joel Amaya re3 Order Dismissing Case(msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
5 | 5
misc
Received Document
Tue 03/07 10:09 AM
Received Document: Prisoner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Alexis Joel Amaya.(msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judgment
Tue 02/28 3:48 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/28/2017.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 02/28 3:29 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/28/2017.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 02/16 11:13 AM
Received Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 34611122261. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: IFP
Wed 01/11 4:38 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/17/2017. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 01/11 4:36 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee IFPP.). Filed byAlexis Joel Amaya.(msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |