Zizi et al v. All About Service Limousine, Inc. et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Cam Ferenbach |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00088 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 1:56 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
All About Service Limousine, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Mick Manly
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Juley Zizi
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Tsadok Zizi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
All About Service Limousine, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mick Manly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juley Zizi
% Kemp & Kemp 7435 W. Azure Drive, Suite 110
LAS VEGAS, NV 89130 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tsadok Zizi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
83 | 83
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 02/26 2:56 PM
ORDER granting82 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) |
|
Wednesday, February 24, 2021 | ||
82 | 82
motion
Stipulation
Wed 02/24 10:09 PM
STIPULATION and Order to Dismiss With Prejudice re81 Order on Stipulation by Counter Defendants Tsadok Zizi, Tsadok Zizi, Plaintiff Tsadok Zizi. (Kemp, James) |