Pathak v. Pathak et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | George Foley, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00102 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 2:00 AM PDT |
Cross Claimant
Nerry Pathak
|
|
Cross Claimant
Anshu Bharat Pathak
|
|
Cross Defendant
Sierra Meat Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Nerry Pathak
|
|
Cross Defendant
Anshu Bharat Pathak
|
|
Cross Defendant
Jose L
|
|
Cross Defendant
Matt Davis
|
|
Cross Defendant
Monge Cordero
|
|
Cross Defendant
Best Iguana Puerto Rico Meat Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anshu Bharat Pathak
5615 Cameron St Suite 7
Las Vegas, NV 89118 |
|
Defendant
Jonathan Mosbacher
|
|
Defendant
Armand Agra Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Stephen J Flocchini
|
|
Defendant
Stephan Flocchini
|
|
Defendant
Rick Flocchini
|
|
Defendant
Rich Flocchini
|
|
Defendant
Patrick Flocchini
|
|
Defendant
John Flocchini
|
|
Defendant
Chris Flocchini
|
|
Defendant
Bud Flocchini
|
|
Defendant
Bernadette Flocchini
|
|
Defendant
Raquel Ferrari
|
|
Defendant
Durham Ranch
|
|
Defendant
Sierra Meat Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nerry Pathak
8465 W. Sahara Ave., Ste 111-217
Las Vegas, NV 89117 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Cross Defendant
Broadleaf Vension (USA) Inc.
Terminated: 05/19/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
108 | 108
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Set Aside
Tue 03/31 2:24 PM
ORDER denying102 Motion to Set Aside; ORDER denying104 Motion to Set Aside. Sanctions are imposed against Anshu Pathak. Anshu Pathak is ordered to pay attorneys' fees in the amount of $3442.50 within two (2) weeks of the date of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that sanctions are imposed against Nerry Pathak. Nerry Pathak is ordered to pay attorneys' fees in the amount of $2197.50 within two (2) weeks of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance - JM) |