Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-10134

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jerry A Brown
Case #: 2:17-ap-01012
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2017
Terminated:Jan 10, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Franchelle Simpson
28 Imogene Street
Westwego, LA 70094
Represented By
Franchelle Simpson
contact info
Plaintiff
Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee
3027 Ridgelake Drive
Metairie, LA 70002
Represented By
Albert J. Derbes, IV
The Derbes Law Firm, L.L.C.
contact info
Kaja Stamnes Elmer
The Derbes Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, January 10, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/10 3:47 PM
Adversary Case Closed 2:17-ap-1012. (Waker, K.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
6 6 miscap Certificate of Service Tue 02/14 9:44 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)5 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding) (Derbes, Albert
5 5 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/14 8:37 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on February 14, 2017. (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
4 4 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/01 4:16 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice Filed by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee (Derbes, Albert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 01/12 11:18 AM
Summons Service Executed on Franchelle Simpson 1/12/2017 . (Elmer, Kaja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 01/11 3:13 PM
Summons Issued on Franchelle Simpson Answer Due 2/10/2017. (Donelon, G)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/11 2:10 PM
Adversary case 17-01012 Complaint by Wilbur J. Babin, Jr. Trustee against Franchelle Simpson. Fee Amount $350. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Derbes, Albert)
Related: [-]