Total Quality Logistics, LLC v. Elite Transit Solutions, LLC et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Barrett |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00034 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Apr 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 17, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 5:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
Elite Recruiting Solutions, LLC
4 West Manilla Avenue Second Floor
Pittsburgh, PA 15220 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elite Transit Solutions, LLC
4 West Manilla Avenue Second Floor
Pittsburgh, PA 15220 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
George Scheffel, III
101 South 12th Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15203 |
|
Defendant
Justin Ketchum
|
|
Plaintiff
Total Quality Logistics, LLC
4289 Ivy Pointe Blvd.
Cincinnati, OH 45245 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 10/17 9:53 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jlw) |
||
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 10/16 12:58 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Total Quality Logistics, LLC OF DISMISSAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Fagel, Barry) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 09/30 5:16 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2019. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/30/19. (ba) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/22 4:11 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Total Quality Logistics, LLC re Notice of Deadline (Fagel, Barry) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
notice
Notice of Deadline
Fri 02/01 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Deadline: The parties shall file a Status Report due by 2/22/2019. (ba) |
||
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 10/26 10:20 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 10/26/2018; Barry Fagel appeared for Plaintiff; no appearance by defendants; plaintiff indicates he will seek default. (ba) |
||
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/23 10:08 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Total Quality Logistics, LLC OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ELITE RECRUITING SOLUTIONS, LLC (Fagel, Barry) |
|
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 07/23 11:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 7/23/2018; Barry Fagel appeared for Plaintiff; no appear for defendants; plaintiff requires additional time to conclude his efforts regarding service; a follow up Status Conference is set for 10/26/2018 at 10:00 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 7/9/18 for conferencing instructions . (ba) |
||
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/13 8:38 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion that Case Stay on Court's Active Docket. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/12/18. (ba) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Tue 03/06 4:16 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to George Scheffel, III. (bjc) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Fri 02/02 1:56 PM
Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Regular Mailing re2 COMPLAINT and15 Summons Issued. (eh) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Thu 01/25 3:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of Clerk: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (bjc) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipt | ||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/23 9:59 AM
Summons Issued as to George Scheffel, III. (bjc) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/22 4:17 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. on George Scheffel, III (Fagel, Barry) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 12/27 2:06 PM
MOTION Motion/Request that Case Stay on Court's Active Docket by Plaintiff Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Fagel, Barry) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 12/27 1:51 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Total Quality Logistics, LLC of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Elite Transit Solutions, LLC Only (Fagel, Barry) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 09/29 4:18 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to a 90 day conditional dismissal. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/29/17. (ba) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Tue 08/15 9:12 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to George Scheffel, III. (eh) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Thu 08/10 12:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing: The Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio has been requested to issue the complaint and summons to Defendant Justin Ketchum. The requested service was sent by regular mail on 8/10/2017. (eh) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Wed 08/09 2:01 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Justin Ketchum. (eh) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Mon 07/24 11:22 AM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing: The Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio has been requested to issue the complaint and summons to the defendants. The requested service was sent by certified mail on 7/24/2017. (jlw) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipt | ||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/21 11:09 AM
Summons Issued as to Justin Ketchum, George Scheffel, III. (jlw) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 07/20 10:43 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Fagel, Barry) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 07/20 10:42 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Fagel, Barry) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Permanent Injunction
Fri 01/13 8:40 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (ss) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/13 7:58 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Elite Recruiting Solutions, LLC, Elite Transit Solutions, LLC, Justin Ketchum, George Scheffel, III, filed by Total Quality Logistics, LLC. Filed in Clermont County Court of Common Pleas on 1/6/2017 as case 2017 CVH 00019. (jlw) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 01/13 7:50 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw) |
||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 01/12 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clermont County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2017 CVH 00019 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5797954), filed by Elite Recruiting Solutions, LLC, Elite Transit Solutions, LLC. (O'Shea, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Combined Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal |