Walnoha et al v. Abbott Laboratories Inc. et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00039 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 5:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Abbvie Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A.J. Crawford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachary Heaton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tatiana G Monjarrez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Olivas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cody Walnoha
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 12/21 6:39 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/21/2017. (cw) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Dismiss
Wed 12/20 4:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss /Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Agreed Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs A.J. Crawford, Zachary Heaton, Tatiana G Monjarrez, Kevin Olivas, Cody Walnoha. (Sampson, Phillip) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Response (non motion)
Wed 07/19 11:31 AM
Response re27 Notice (Other) by Plaintiffs A.J. Crawford, Zachary Heaton, Tatiana G Monjarrez, Kevin Olivas, Cody Walnoha. (Sampson, Phillip) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/10 6:24 PM
NOTICE by Defendants Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbvie Inc. of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Their Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Geoppinger, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 05/15 8:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Memorandum in Support thereof filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbvie Inc.. (Thomas, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/01 11:27 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) filed by Plaintiffs A.J. Crawford, Zachary Heaton, Tatiana G Monjarrez, Kevin Olivas, Cody Walnoha. (Sampson, Phillip) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Related Case Memorandum
Fri 04/28 3:26 PM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:14cv00145 2:14cv01052 are NOT related. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley, Judge George C. Smith and Judge Susan J. Dlott on 4/28/17. (jlk) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/13 9:09 AM
For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is GRANTED. (Doc. 22). Consequently, Plaintiffs shall have until May 1, 2017, to file their Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/13/2017. (KAJ) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/12 3:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) New date requested 5/1/2017. by Plaintiffs A.J. Crawford, Zachary Heaton, Tatiana G Monjarrez, Kevin Olivas, Cody Walnoha. (Balser, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/11 8:51 AM
ORDER granting18 ,19 , and20 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John A. McCauley, Christina L. Gaarder, and David S. Gray. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/10/2017. (agm) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/10 10:45 AM
NOTICE TERMINATING DEADLINES/HEARINGS - The Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for 4/12/2017 is VACATED. (jr) |
||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/07 10:48 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5909605) of David S. Gray by Defendants Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbvie Inc.. (Geoppinger, Jeffrey) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/07 10:41 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5909591) of Christina L. Gaarder by Defendants Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbvie Inc.. (Geoppinger, Jeffrey) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/07 10:34 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5909553) of John A. McCauley by Defendants Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbvie Inc.. (Geoppinger, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Wed 04/05 5:04 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT of the Parties (Joint) by Defendants Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbvie Inc.. (Geoppinger, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Form Rule 26(f) Report | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/27 4:47 PM
NOTICE by Defendants Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbvie Inc. of Related Cases (Thomas, Joseph) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 03/27 4:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendants Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbvie Inc.. (Thomas, Joseph) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 03/27 4:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) by Defendants Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbvie Inc.. (Thomas, Joseph) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 03/20 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2017 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) |
|
Att: 1 Rule 26(f) Report | ||
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 03/10 8:18 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Abbott Laboratories Inc. answer due 3/27/2017; Abbvie Inc. answer due 3/27/2017. (er) |
||
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Thu 03/09 4:06 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants Abbott Laboratories Inc. and AbbVie Inc. to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendants Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbvie Inc.. (Geoppinger, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/14 1:00 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nancy McEvily Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/14/2017. (agm) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/13 3:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5839719) of Nancy McEvily Davis by Plaintiffs A.J. Crawford, Zachary Heaton, Tatiana G Monjarrez, Kevin Olivas, Cody Walnoha. (Balser, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/08 12:04 PM
ORDER granting4 ,5 ,6 , and7 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Phillip L. Sampson, Jr., Heath A. Novosad, Blair R. Loocke, and Carlton D. Wilde III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/8/2017. (agm) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/07 5:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5831990) of Carlton D. Wilde III by Plaintiffs A.J. Crawford, Zachary Heaton, Tatiana G Monjarrez, Kevin Olivas, Cody Walnoha. (Balser, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Cert of Good Standing | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/07 5:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5831989) of Blair R. Loocke by Plaintiffs A.J. Crawford, Zachary Heaton, Tatiana G Monjarrez, Kevin Olivas, Cody Walnoha. (Balser, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Cert of Good Standing | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/07 5:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5831986) of Heath A. Novosad by Plaintiffs A.J. Crawford, Zachary Heaton, Tatiana G Monjarrez, Kevin Olivas, Cody Walnoha. (Balser, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Cert of Good Standing | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/07 5:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5831970) of Phillip L. Sampson, Jr. by Plaintiffs A.J. Crawford, Zachary Heaton, Tatiana G Monjarrez, Kevin Olivas, Cody Walnoha. (Balser, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Cert of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 01/19 5:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Abbvie Inc. on 1/13/2017, answer due 3/14/2017. (Balser, Brian) |
|
2 | 2
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 01/19 5:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Abbott Laboratories Inc. on 1/13/2017, answer due 3/14/2017. (Balser, Brian) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/12 4:44 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5798007), filed by Tatiana G Monjarrez, Cody Walnoha, Kevin Olivas, A.J. Crawford, Zachary Heaton. (Balser, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |