Cotton v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward M Chen |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00161 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:227 Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:27 AM PDT |
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shalandra Cotton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 06/08 9:36 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 of Dismissal filed by Shalandra Cotton. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/8/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 06/07 10:12 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Shalandra Cotton.(Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Case Stayed ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 02/15 3:53 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 FOR ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Case stayed. Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/14/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/15/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 02/14 8:54 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,.(Goldsmith, Scott) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Tue 02/07 10:18 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2017. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/7/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 02/03 1:26 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. (Goldsmith, Scott) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 01/30 4:44 PM
ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/30/17.(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Fri 01/27 12:34 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 01/26 1:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shalandra Cotton. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., served on 1/17/2017, answer due 2/7/2017. (Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 01/20 7:39 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shalandra Cotton.. (Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/13 11:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 01/13 11:46 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 01/12 1:50 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/26/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 01/12 12:06 PM
Proposed Summons. (Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/12 12:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11070098.). Filed byShalandra Cotton.(Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |