Cabrera v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Phyllis J Hamilton |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00164 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:07 AM PDT |
Defendant
California Reconveyance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deutsche Bank National Trust Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Long Beach Mortgage Company
|
|
Defendant
Long Beach Securities Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis B. Cabrera
353 2nd Avenue
Daly City, CA 94014 |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Receipt
Fri 03/24 3:56 PM
Acknowledgement from San Mateo County Superior Court re remand documents. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
utility
Remark
Mon 03/13 10:32 AM
Sent certified copies of Remand Order and docket entries to San Mateo County Superior Court. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Judgment
Fri 03/10 8:59 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 03/10/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017) (napS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (3/10/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Remand
Fri 03/10 8:58 AM
ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 20 Motion to Remand, Granting in Part 11 Motion to Dismiss, and Remanding State Law Claims. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017) (napS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (3/10/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Tue 02/21 10:44 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byCalifornia Reconveyance Company, Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Long Beach Securities Corp..(Liu, David) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Tue 02/14 10:30 AM
REPLY filed byCalifornia Reconveyance Company, Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Long Beach Securities Corp..(Liu, David) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
oth_sup
Declaration in Opposition
Thu 02/09 9:33 AM
DECLARATION of Luis B. Cabrera's in Opposition to11 MOTION to Dismiss filed byLuis B. Cabrera. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Thu 02/09 9:31 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byLuis B. Cabrera. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Remand
Thu 02/09 9:29 AM
MOTION to Remand filed by Luis B. Cabrera. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 2/22/2017. Replies due by 3/1/2017.(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 02/03 9:03 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
||
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
adr
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held
Thu 02/02 11:44 AM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 2/2/2017 with Tamara Lange. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/02 10:36 AM
NOTICE by California Reconveyance Company, Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Long Beach Securities Corp. re11 MOTION to Dismiss Rescheduling Hearing(Liu, David) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 01/31 10:20 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on January 31, 2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
16 | 16
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
Tue 01/31 8:36 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/30 11:26 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Luis B. Cabrera.(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
14 | 14
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/26 10:51 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Reconveyance Company, Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Long Beach Securities Corp...(Liu, David) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/25 10:19 AM
NOTICE by California Reconveyance Company, Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re12 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference,(Liu, David) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
Mon 01/23 9:49 AM
Updated ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, February 2, 2017, at 10:30 AM Pacific time. Please note new call-in information is provided in this notice. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document.(af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Thu 01/19 10:19 AM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by California Reconveyance Company, Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Long Beach Securities Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 2/2/2017. Replies due by 2/9/2017.(Liu, David) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Reques for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to RJN, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to RJN, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to RJN, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to RJN, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to RJN, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to RJN, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 to RJN, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 to RJN, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 to RJN, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 to RJN, | ||
Att: 12 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 13 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
Wed 01/18 1:34 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, February 2, 2017, at 10:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document.(af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/17 3:08 PM
NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Amended) of Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference & ADR Deadlines(Liu, David) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/17 3:05 PM
NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Amended) of Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore(Liu, David) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/17 10:00 AM
NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines(Liu, David) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/17 9:58 AM
NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Liu, David) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Fri 01/13 5:08 PM
ORDER Referring Case to ADR Unit for Assessment Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/13/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 01/12 3:16 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 01/12 1:55 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/26/2017. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 01/12 1:12 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Liu, David) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 01/12 1:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (jury demand by plaintiff) from Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo. Their case number is 16CIV02094. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11070322). Filed byJ PMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Liu, David) (Filed on 1/12/2017) Modified on 1/12/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |