Bradford v. Dollar Loan Center, LLC
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Larry R Hicks |
Referred: | Valerie P Cooke |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00017 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporti |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 2:01 AM PDT |
Defendant
Dollar Loan Center, LLC
% Charles C. Brennan 6122 W. Sahara Ave.
Las Vegas, NV 89146 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Bradford
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 03/10 2:32 PM
ORDER dismissing with prejudice this action per ECF No.3 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 03/08 3:15 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiff Robert Bradford. (Nelson, Vernon) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Thu 01/12 9:26 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Dollar Loan Center, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent DLC Empire, LLC for Dollar Loan Center, LLC added. . |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Thu 01/12 2:00 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. (WJ) |
||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District, Case Number CV16-02522, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-4433654), filed by Dollar Loan Center, LLC. NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - B |