Sweetwater Malibu Inc
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Victoria S Kaufman |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10097 |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 10, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Apr 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2017 |
Debtor
Sweetwater Malibu Inc
7108 De Soto Ave Ste 200
Canoga Park, CA 91303-3230 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Diane Weil (TR)
1900 Avenue of the Stars, 11th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 01/13/2017 12:02 PM PST |