Hillspring Health Care Center v. Director, Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, et al.
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephanie K Bowman |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00035 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1396 - Tort Negligence |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 5:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Director, Ohio Department of Job and Family Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director, Ohio Department of Medicaid
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hillspring Health Care Center
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 01/04 1:15 PM
JUDGMENT entered by Clerk affirming Court Order30 dismissing case. (km) |
|
30 | 30
30+
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 01/04 12:53 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. This case is TERMINATED on the docket of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/4/2018. (km) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Supplemental - Opposing (non motion)
Tue 11/28 3:26 PM
Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re10 MOTION to Dismiss Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center. (Van Lake, Katie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A- Order | ||
28 | 28
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 11/28 1:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center. (Wilfong, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 11/22 3:37 PM
ORDER granting25 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw the Appearance of Attorney Mary L Pisciotta as Counsel for Plaintiff. Attorneys Elizabeth Wilfong and Katie Z. Van Lake of the Law Firm Sb2, Inc. will continue their representation of Plaintiff in these proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 11/22/2017. (km) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Wed 11/22 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Julie E Brigner substituting for Ara Mekhjian as to Defendants Director, Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Director, Ohio Department of Medicaid. (Brigner, Julie) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 11/21 11:51 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Mary Pisciotta by Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center. (Wilfong, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Ex. A | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/21 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Wilfong for Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center (Wilfong, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Supplemental - Opposing (non motion)
Fri 07/14 11:54 AM
Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re10 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center. (Pisciotta, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Errata Exhibit A, Appeal Decision | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Wed 06/21 7:59 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Julie E Brigner substituting for Deborah A. Enck as to Defendants Director, Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Director, Ohio Department of Medicaid. (Brigner, Julie) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Supplemental - Opposing (non motion)
Wed 06/07 2:30 PM
Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re10 MOTION to Dismiss (Supplemental Authority) by Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center. (Pisciotta, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Opinion in IL | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 06/07 11:50 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Telephone Conference held on 6/7/2017. Attorney Katie Van Lake appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Deborah Enck appeared on behalf of Defendants. Conference to be reset, if necessary, after ruling on the pending motion to dismiss. No calendar is established at this time. (km) |
||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Telephone Conference
Tue 05/16 2:20 PM
NOTICE: Telephonic Consent Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2017 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Counsel shall call 1-888-363-4749 to participate in the telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. The conference access code is 8651321 and the security code is 2010. NOTE: You will be required to use this information each time the Court conducts a telephone conference unless otherwise instructed. (km) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Response (non motion)
Tue 05/16 12:58 PM
Response re17 Notice (Other) to Defendant's Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center. (Van Lake, Katie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
18 | 18
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 05/16 9:51 AM
ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/16/17. (ba) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/15 3:05 PM
NOTICE by Defendants Director, Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Director, Ohio Department of Medicaid re14 Reply to Response to Motion Notice of Supplemental Authority (Enck, Deborah) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 05/09 3:38 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT Joint Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center. (Pisciotta, Mary) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/05 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah A. Enck for Defendants Director, Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Director, Ohio Department of Medicaid (Enck, Deborah) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 05/04 4:57 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Director, Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Director, Ohio Department of Medicaid. (Enck, Deborah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 04/27 10:11 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED12 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/27/17. (eh) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/27 10:13 AM
Reset Deadlines per doc.13 : Defendant's Reply as to10 MOTION to Dismiss due by 5/4/2017. (eh) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 04/21 1:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/4/2017. by Defendants Director, Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Director, Ohio Department of Medicaid. (Enck, Deborah) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/10 4:00 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center. (Pisciotta, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit DAR Form, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Common Pleas Decision | ||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Deadline
Fri 04/07 8:02 AM
NOTICE of Deadline: Please be aware that the Rule 26(f) Report is due by 5/10/2017; Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Mon 03/20 11:16 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Director, Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Director, Ohio Department of Medicaid. (Enck, Deborah) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Thu 03/16 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Ara Mekhjian substituting for Amy Goldstein as to Defendants Director, Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Director, Ohio Department of Medicaid. (Mekhjian, Ara) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 03/07 1:53 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katie Van Lake by Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center and finding as moot5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/7/17. (ba) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/27 1:51 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center (Pisciotta, Mary) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 02/09 2:09 PM
AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (see doc.5 ) (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5833320) of Katie Van Lake by Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center. (Pisciotta, Mary) Modified docket text on 2/9/2017 (eh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/08 3:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5833320) of Katie Van Lake by Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center. (Pisciotta, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 02/02 11:32 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to All Defendants. (Enck, Deborah) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 01/26 3:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT and Petition for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants, filed by Hillspring Health Care Center. (Pisciotta, Mary) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/13 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary L. Pisciotta for Plaintiff Hillspring Health Care Center (Pisciotta, Mary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/13 10:13 AM
COMPLAINT against John B. McCarthy ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5798532), filed by Hillspring Health Care Center. (Pisciotta, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |