Bonilla v. Lopey et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Referred: | Pslc Rmh |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00159 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Defendant
Francie Koehler
|
|
Defendant
Gerald Dietrich
|
|
Defendant
James Lopey
|
|
Defendant
Randy Ontiveros
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven Wayne Bonilla
|
GPO
Jan 19 2017
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/19/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |