Miller v. City of Oakley et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Donato |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00206 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 14, 2017 2:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
City of Oakley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
County of Contra Costa
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Fabel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher Hamblin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ryan Maclennan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Riddle
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FNU Schultz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Miller
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 30 2017
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Response due by 12:00 p.m. on Friday, July 7, 2017. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/30/2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017) |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/30 2:22 PM
ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/29/2018. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 03/27 1:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 3/27/2018. Case settled. Parties signed a settlement agreement this date. (Not Reported)(Time: 2.5 hours) Attorneys for Plaintiff: Lateef Gray; James Cook. Attorney for Defendant: Patrick Hurley. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/27/2018) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
3
pgs
order
Order Setting Settlement Conference
Fri 02/09 3:41 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 3/27/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/9/2018. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 10/12 7:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Early neutral evaluation/Settlement Conference held on 10/11/2017. Discussions are ongoing. The Court will check back with the parties in January 2018 if case has not resolved by then. (Not Reported) (Time: 4 hours) Attorneys for Plaintiff: John Burris; Lateef Gray. Attorney for Defendants: Patrick Hurley. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/11/2017) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 09/29 9:46 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 9/29/2017. Attorney for Plaintiff: James Cook. Attorney for Defendants: Patrick Hurley. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2017) |
|
33 | 33
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/29 9:43 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/29/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 07/25 2:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 7/25/2017. An in person settlement conference on October 11, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. The Court will also hold a pre-conference planning call with the parties on September 29, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Not reported)(Time: 15 minutes) Attorney for Plaintiff: James Cook. Attorney for Defendants: Patrick Hurley. This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/25/2017) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Fri 07/07 10:43 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Gary Miller . (Cook, James) (Filed on 7/7/2017) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 06/30 12:40 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Response due by 12:00 p.m. on Friday, July 7, 2017. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/30/2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017) |
|
29 | 29
minutes
Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Case Referred to Magistrate-Judge for Settlement Conference
Fri 06/30 10:05 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/29/2017., CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Corley for Settlement ConferenceTotal Time in Court 4 Minutes. Court Reporter Name Debbie Paz. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/30/2017) |
|
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
Fri 06/30 10:40 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Thu 06/22 4:23 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Brian Fabel, Christopher Hamblin, Ryan Maclennan, David Riddle, FNU Schultz. (Hurley, Patrick) (Filed on 6/22/2017) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 06/19 10:25 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/29/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017) |
|
26 | 26
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 06/19 7:57 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Initial Case Management Conference continued to 8/31/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
adr
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held
Thu 06/15 1:50 PM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard Herman on June 15, 2017. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
adr
ADR Remark
Thu 06/01 7:50 AM
ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled on June 15, 2017, (Docket No.23 ) shall now commence at 11:30 AM, not 10:00 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
Fri 04/28 11:16 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, June 15, 2017, at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
adr
Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
Thu 04/27 4:46 PM
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Joint Notice) (Hurley, Patrick) (Filed on 4/27/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/20 2:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byChristopher Hamblin, Ryan Maclennan, David Riddle, FNU Schultz. (Hurley, Patrick) (Filed on 4/20/2017) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 04/14 1:39 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 04/13 3:49 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Brian Fabel, Christopher Hamblin, Ryan Maclennan, David Riddle, FNU Schultz. (Hurley, Patrick) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Tue 04/04 9:28 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gray, Lateef) (Filed on 4/4/2017) |
|
17 | 17
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice
Tue 04/04 8:13 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 03/13 11:00 AM
Order by Hon. James Donato granting 15 Stipulation. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 03/07 8:53 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing the Monell Cause of Action in Plaintiff's Complaint filed by City of Oakley, County of Contra Costa. (Hurley, Patrick) (Filed on 3/7/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Thu 02/23 9:20 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2017.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/23/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 02/21 12:26 PM
ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/21/17.(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Fri 02/17 1:18 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 02/17 11:47 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gary Miller.. (Gray, Lateef) (Filed on 2/17/2017) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/17 11:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Miller. All Defendants. (Gray, Lateef) (Filed on 2/17/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/07 10:45 AM
Summons Issued as to City of Oakley, County of Contra Costa, Brian Fabel, Christopher Hamblin, Ryan Maclennan, David Riddle, FNU Schultz. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 02/06 3:47 PM
Proposed Summons. (Gray, Lateef) (Filed on 2/6/2017) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Mon 02/06 3:44 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Gary Miller as to All Defendants. (Gray, Lateef) (Filed on 2/6/2017) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 02/03 3:38 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff Gary Miller shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/17/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/03 1:22 PM
Summons Issued as to City of Oakley, County of Contra Costa, Brian Fabel, Christopher Hamblin, Ryan Maclennan, David Riddle, FNU Schultz. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 02/02 4:49 PM
Proposed Summons. (Gray, Lateef) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 01/17 10:57 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2017 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/17/17. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 01/17 7:52 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2017. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Sunday, January 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 01/15 5:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11076222.). Filed byGary Miller.(Burris, John) (Filed on 1/15/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |