LS Wind Down, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig T Goldblatt |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10125 |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 02, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Limited Stores, LLC
7775 Walton Pkwy Ste 400
New Albany, OH 43054-8203 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago |
Monday, December 27, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
claims
Claims Register
Mon 12/27 3:10 PM
Final Claims Register Alpha and Numeric . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
Att: 1 Numeric Claims Register | ||
Thursday, December 02, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
order
Final Decree
Thu 12/02 4:12 PM
Order and Final Decree (I) Closing the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases; (II) Approving Abandonment of Remaining Plan Trust Assets; and (III) Discharging the Plan Trustee and Plan Trust Oversight Committee Signed on 12/2/2021 (NR) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 12/02 4:13 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NR) |
||
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
court
Case Reassigned
Mon 04/26 4:15 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Karen B. Owens Terminated (BA) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 06/18 9:14 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge Signed 6/18/2019. Judge Karen B. Owens added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (BA) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
Case Reassigned
Fri 05/03 9:27 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (SH) |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
claims
Certification of No Claims Activity
Thu 12/27 11:11 AM
Certification of No Claims Activity . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/19 9:39 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50005 Closed (LMD) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Appearance - Notice
Wed 06/07 5:04 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Mason Companies, Inc.. (Schumacher, Thomas) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Schedules/Statements
Fri 02/10 3:16 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Case No. 17-10125 Filed by Limited Stores, LLC. (Yurkewicz, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Schedules/Statements
Fri 02/10 3:13 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Case No. 17-10125 Filed by Limited Stores, LLC. (Yurkewicz, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order-Joint Admin
Wed 01/18 1:31 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Limited Stores Company, LLC, Limited Stores, LLC, and The Limited Stores GC LLC. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 17-10124 (KJC) Order Signed on 1/18/2017 (LMD) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 01/17 4:07 PM
Adversary case 17-50005 Complaint by Kaitlin O'Rourke against Kaitlin O'Rourke. Fee Amount $350 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 04/17/2017. (Huggett, James) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Appearance - Notice
Tue 01/17 9:26 AM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Simon Property Group Inc.. (Tucker, Ronald) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Tue 01/17 2:08 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Limited Stores Company, LLC, Limited Stores, LLC, The Limited Stores GC, LLC. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 01/17 1:54 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10125 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8306356, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
26
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 01/17 1:46 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Limited Stores, LLC. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Tue 01/17 8:00 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case. (SG) |