Iglesias v. Welch Foods Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thelton E Henderson |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00219 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 1:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Promotion In Motion, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Welch Foods Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Iglesias
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 04 2017
ORDER Granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/4/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017) |
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Receipt
Mon 04/17 1:10 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of certified copy of remand order and certified copy of docket entries from Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Francisco. (tnS) (Filed on 4/14/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
utility
Remark
Thu 04/06 12:37 PM
certified copy of remand order and certified copy of docket entries mailed to Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Francisco. (tnS) (Filed on 4/6/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Tue 04/04 11:41 AM
ORDER Granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/4/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 04/03 2:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson: Motion Hearing held on 4/3/2017. re 19 MOTION to Remand PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REMAND; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Thomas Iglesias Total Time in Court 14 minutes. Court Reporter Name Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorney Rosemary Rivas. Defendant Attorney Kimberly Culp; Daniel Silverman. Attachment Civil Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/3/2017) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 03/27 5:46 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re17 Clerk's Notice to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference filed by Promotion In Motion, Inc., Welch Foods Inc.. (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/27/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Thu 03/09 6:31 PM
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND filed byThomas Iglesias. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 3/9/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Thu 03/02 1:57 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byPromotion In Motion, Inc., Welch Foods Inc..(Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/2/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Scott Yales | ||
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 02/22 2:57 PM
STIPULATION Second Stipulation to Extend Time To Respond to Initial Complaint to May 1, 2017 filed by Promotion In Motion, Inc., Welch Foods Inc.. (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/22/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Remand
Thu 02/16 6:11 PM
MOTION to Remand PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REMAND; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Thomas Iglesias. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 3/2/2017. Replies due by 3/9/2017.(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 2/16/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Change In Counsel
Thu 02/16 5:55 PM
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 2/16/2017) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 01/30 12:51 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 01/30 10:15 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on January 30, 2017.(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
15 | 15
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Mon 01/30 8:23 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/17 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Gurvitz (Gurvitz, Matthew) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/17 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Scott Silverman (Silverman, Daniel) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
6 | 6
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 01/17 1:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Promotion In Motion Companies, Inc., Welch Foods Inc., A Cooperative re2 Certificate of Interested Entities,5 Statement,3 Certificate of Interested Entities,4 Statement,1 Notice of Removal,, (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Statement
Tue 01/17 1:23 PM
Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement (FRCP 7.1) by Promotion In Motion Companies, Inc.. (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Statement
Tue 01/17 1:21 PM
Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement (FRCP 7.1) by Welch Foods Inc., A Cooperative. (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Tue 01/17 1:17 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Promotion In Motion Companies, Inc. (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Tue 01/17 1:12 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Welch Foods Inc., A Cooperative identifying Corporate Parent National Grape Co-Operative Association, Inc. for Welch Foods Inc., A Cooperative. (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 01/17 12:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-16-555566. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11078151). Filed byPromotion In Motion Companies, Inc., Welch Foods Inc., A Cooperative.(Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Scott Yales, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Kimberly Culp, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit A to Declaration of Kimberly Culp, | ||
Att: 4 25 pgs Exhibit B to Declaration of Kimberly Culp, | ||
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit C to Declaration of Kimberly Culp, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |