ROOMING INC 501C3
Arizona Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Paul Sala |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-00448 |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Feb 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Debtor
ROOMING INC 501C3
70 E Mitchell Dr
Phoenix, AZ 85012-2344 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
MAUREEN GAUGHAN
PO BOX 6729
CHANDLER, AZ 85246 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003 |
Docket last updated: 01/18/2017 12:02 AM MST |