Iacovacci v. Nokley et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00148 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 2:37 AM PDT |
Defendant
Robert W. Nokley, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nokley Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Iacovacci
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
69 | 69
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/04 12:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for68 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff Paul Iacovacci. (Andersen, Ryan) |
|
68 | 68
notice
Notice Other
Thu 01/04 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Order by Paul Iacovacci re67 Order on Stipulation,,,,,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings,. (Andersen, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
67 | 67
8
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 01/03 9:38 AM
ORDER that ECF No.66 Stipulation Regarding Claim of Exemption is APPROVED in its entirety; Claim of Exemption hearing scheduled for 3:30 P.M. on 01/04/2018 vacated . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
66 | 66
motion
Stipulation
Tue 01/02 2:49 PM
Amended STIPULATION REGARDING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION re64 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,54 Objection to Document,53 Motion by Plaintiff Paul Iacovacci. (Andersen, Ryan) |
|
65 | 65
motion
Stipulation
Tue 01/02 2:41 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION re64 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,54 Objection to Document,53 Motion by Plaintiff Paul Iacovacci. (Andersen, Ryan) |