Saruby v. Colvin
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Carl W Hoffman |
Referred: | Carl W Hoffman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00150 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 08, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, November 07, 2022 | ||
misc
Docket Entry - Generic
Mon 11/07 9:46 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. The above-captioned case has been closed as of 2/8/19. The lodged copies of the administrative record are no longer needed by this court. Counsel for the government shall have to and including 30 days to make arrangements to pick up the administrative record from the clerk's office, or counsel shall file a notice notifying the clerk's office that the administrative record may be discarded. (no image attached) (NEV) |
||
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Judgment
Fri 02/08 10:16 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration, and against Joseph Saruby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
24 | 24
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to Agency ~Util - Terminate Case
Fri 02/08 10:13 AM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that22 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 23 the Commissioner's cross-motion to affirm is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court must enter judgment in favor of Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration, and against plaintiff Joseph Saruby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response
Thu 03/01 3:35 PM
RESPONSE to22 Motion to Remand to Agency by Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. Replies due by 3/8/2018. (Lahey, Sharon) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Motion Remand to Agency
Wed 01/31 2:53 PM
MOTION to Remand to Social Security by Plaintiff Joseph Saruby. Responses due by 2/14/2018. (Kalagian, Marc) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order on Unopposed Motion
Fri 01/19 3:17 PM
ORDER Granting20 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Unopposed Motion
Wed 01/17 4:11 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time by Plaintiff Joseph Saruby. (Kalagian, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 11/22 3:47 PM
ORDER Granting18 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation
Tue 11/21 4:27 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) by Plaintiff Joseph Saruby. (Kalagian, Marc) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Wed 09/27 12:13 PM
ORDER Granting16 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Stipulation
Mon 09/25 4:05 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Plaintiff Joseph Saruby. (Kalagian, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Wed 08/30 1:30 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MR) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
4
pgs
order
Order Concerning Review of Social Security Cases
Fri 08/25 4:14 PM
SPECIAL SCHEDULING ORDER CONCERNING REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Manual Filing
Wed 08/23 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Manual Filing by Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. Social Security Administrative Record manually filed with the Magistrate Judge's chambers. (Woolf, Mark) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/23 8:52 AM
ANSWER to4 Complaint filed by Carolyn W. Colvin.(Lahey, Sharon) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge on Consent
Mon 07/10 3:12 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to United States Magistrate Judge on Consent in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c). All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:17-cv-00150-CWH . Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/28 8:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sharon Lahey on behalf of Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. (Lahey, Sharon) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 06/29 11:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re5 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney's Office. (MR) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 06/27 2:01 PM
Certified Mail Returned Receipt 7015 3010 0002 3530 7126 for5 Summons Issued as to USA re4 Complaint. (MR) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/19 4:53 PM
Certified Mail Receipts 7015 3010 0002 3530 7126 and 7015 3010 0002 3530 7133 for5 Summons Issued as to USA re4 Complaint. (MR) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 06/16 3:38 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Carolyn W. Colvin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cc: AUSA summons to USM - MR) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 3:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin, filed by Joseph Saruby. Proof of service due by 9/13/2017.(MR) |
|
3 | 3
order
Screening Order
Fri 06/16 3:28 PM
SCREENING ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that1 Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court must file1 -1 the complaint. The Clerk of the Court must serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and complaint by certified mail. The Clerk of Court must issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 01/17 4:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Joseph Saruby. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Kalagian, Marc) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/17 4:46 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph Saruby.(Kalagian, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 01/18 8:50 AM
Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (DKJ) |